This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/31/2021 at 18:53:53 (UTC).

LINDA TOUTANT VS FIDELITY NATIONAL TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY E

Case Summary

On 12/12/2013 LINDA TOUTANT filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against FIDELITY NATIONAL TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY E. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARK V. MOONEY. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0459

  • Filing Date:

    12/12/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MARK V. MOONEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TOUTANT LINDA

Defendants and Respondents

CLARY SUSAN

DOES 1 THROUGH 50

ERICKSON DON

FIDELITY NATIONAL LAW GROUP

FIDELITY NATIONAL TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY

HENNELY & GROSSFELD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

KING MICHAEL G. ESQ.

MEYLAN ROBERT L. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FOR 1. BREACH OF CONTRACT; ETC

12/12/2013: COMPLAINT FOR 1. BREACH OF CONTRACT; ETC

SUMMONS -

12/12/2013: SUMMONS -

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

2/11/2014: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

Proof of Service -

2/11/2014: Proof of Service -

CIVIL DEPOSIT -

2/25/2014: CIVIL DEPOSIT -

DEFENDANTS FIDELITY NATIONAL TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY, FIDELITY NATIONAL LAW GROUP AND DON ERICKSON?S REQUEST TO TAKE JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF?S COMPLAINT

4/23/2014: DEFENDANTS FIDELITY NATIONAL TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY, FIDELITY NATIONAL LAW GROUP AND DON ERICKSON?S REQUEST TO TAKE JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF?S COMPLAINT

DEFENDANTS FIDELITY NATIONAL TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY, FIDELITY NATIONAL LAW GROUP AND DON ERICKSON?S NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF?S COMPLAINT; ETC

4/23/2014: DEFENDANTS FIDELITY NATIONAL TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY, FIDELITY NATIONAL LAW GROUP AND DON ERICKSON?S NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF?S COMPLAINT; ETC

Minute Order -

4/24/2014: Minute Order -

FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR 1. BREACH OF CONTRACT; ETC.

6/27/2014: FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR 1. BREACH OF CONTRACT; ETC.

NOTICE TAKING DEFENDANTS DEMURRER OFF-CALENDAR

7/2/2014: NOTICE TAKING DEFENDANTS DEMURRER OFF-CALENDAR

Minute Order -

7/15/2014: Minute Order -

DEFENDANTS FIDELITY NATIONAL TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY, FIDELITY NATIONAL LAW GROUP AND DON ERICKSON'S REQUEST TO TAKE JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

7/30/2014: DEFENDANTS FIDELITY NATIONAL TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY, FIDELITY NATIONAL LAW GROUP AND DON ERICKSON'S REQUEST TO TAKE JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

PLAINTIFFS' POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER OF DEFENDANTS FIDELITY TITLE AND FIDELITY LAW AND JOINDER OF DEFENDANTS HENNELLY & GROSSFLED AND CLARY

9/26/2014: PLAINTIFFS' POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER OF DEFENDANTS FIDELITY TITLE AND FIDELITY LAW AND JOINDER OF DEFENDANTS HENNELLY & GROSSFLED AND CLARY

Minute Order -

10/14/2014: Minute Order -

SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR 1. BREACH OF CONTRACT 2. BREACH OF GOOD FAITH AND FAIR DEALING 3. FRAUD 4. NEGLIGENT MISREPRCSETATION 5. BREACH OF FIDUCIARY DUTY 6. INTENTIONAL INFLICTION OF EMOTIONAL DI

11/3/2014: SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR 1. BREACH OF CONTRACT 2. BREACH OF GOOD FAITH AND FAIR DEALING 3. FRAUD 4. NEGLIGENT MISREPRCSETATION 5. BREACH OF FIDUCIARY DUTY 6. INTENTIONAL INFLICTION OF EMOTIONAL DI

DEFENDANTS FIDELITY NATIONAL TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY, FIDELITY NATIONAL LAW GROUP AND DON ERICKSON'S NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND A

12/8/2014: DEFENDANTS FIDELITY NATIONAL TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY, FIDELITY NATIONAL LAW GROUP AND DON ERICKSON'S NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND A

DEFENDANTS FIDELITY NATIONAL TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY, FIDELITY NATIONAL LAW GROUP AND DON ERICKSON'S REQUEST TO TAKE JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

12/8/2014: DEFENDANTS FIDELITY NATIONAL TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY, FIDELITY NATIONAL LAW GROUP AND DON ERICKSON'S REQUEST TO TAKE JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

Minute Order -

1/30/2015: Minute Order -

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/26/2015
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 68; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2015
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 68; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2015
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Linda Toutant (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2015
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2015
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 68; Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike (Hearing on Demurrer; Sustained) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2015
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2015
  • DocketEx-Parte Application; Filed by Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2015
  • DocketEX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE MAY 26, 2015 TRIAL DATE UNTIL SEPTEMBER 2015 AND TO EXTEND ALL DATES SET BY THE ORIGINAL TRIAL DATE; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF ROBERT L. MEYLAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2015
  • DocketDEFENDANTS FIDELITY NATIONAL TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY, FIDELITY NATIONAL LAW GROUP AND DON ERICKSON'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2015
  • DocketReply/Response; Filed by Fidelity National Title Insurance Company (Defendant); Fidelity National Law Group (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
45 More Docket Entries
  • 02/25/2014
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 68; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Matter continued) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2014
  • DocketCIVIL DEPOSIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2014
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2014
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Linda Toutant (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2014
  • DocketProof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2014
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2013
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2013
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Linda Toutant (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2013
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR 1. BREACH OF CONTRACT; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HENNELLY & GROSSFELD LLP is a litigant

Latest cases where Fidelity National Law Group is a litigant

Latest cases where FIDELITY NATIONAL TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY A NEBRASKA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MEYLAN ROBERT L.