LILLIAN CARTER ET AL VS UNIVERSAL STUDIOS INC ET AL

Court Documents

NOTICE OF FEES DUE FOR CLERK'S TRANSCRIPT ON APPEAL (CIVIL)

9/8/2017: NOTICE OF FEES DUE FOR CLERK'S TRANSCRIPT ON APPEAL (CIVIL)

NOTICE TO REPORTER TO PREPARE TRANSCRIPT ON APPEAL PER CRC RULE 8.124

1/23/2017: NOTICE TO REPORTER TO PREPARE TRANSCRIPT ON APPEAL PER CRC RULE 8.124

APPELLANT'S NOTICE DESIGNATING RECORD ON APPEAL

12/21/2016: APPELLANT'S NOTICE DESIGNATING RECORD ON APPEAL

NOTICE OF DEFAULT

12/13/2016: NOTICE OF DEFAULT

NOTICE OF FILING OF NOTICE OF APPEAL (UNLIMITED JURISDICTION)

11/9/2016: NOTICE OF FILING OF NOTICE OF APPEAL (UNLIMITED JURISDICTION)

NOTICE OF ERRATA AND CORRECTION TO PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF APPEAL

11/8/2016: NOTICE OF ERRATA AND CORRECTION TO PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF APPEAL

PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF APPEAL

11/7/2016: PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF APPEAL

Minute Order - Minute Order (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)

1/8/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)

Case Management Statement

1/4/2019: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - Minute Order (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal...)

11/28/2018: Minute Order - Minute Order (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal...)

Notice of Lien -

9/11/2018: Notice of Lien -

NOTICE OF LIEN

9/11/2018: NOTICE OF LIEN

Notice of Lien

9/11/2018: Notice of Lien

Minute Order -

9/5/2018: Minute Order -

Minute Order - Minute order entered: 2018-09-05 00:00:00

9/5/2018: Minute Order - Minute order entered: 2018-09-05 00:00:00

Case Management Statement -

8/27/2018: Case Management Statement -

Case Management Statement

8/27/2018: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

8/22/2018: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement -

8/22/2018: Case Management Statement -

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

4/9/2018: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Notice of Ruling

3/28/2018: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - Minute order entered: 2018-03-23 00:00:00

3/23/2018: Minute Order - Minute order entered: 2018-03-23 00:00:00

Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter

3/23/2018: Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter

Case Management Statement

3/15/2018: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

3/9/2018: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - Minute order entered: 2017-09-22 00:00:00

9/22/2017: Minute Order - Minute order entered: 2017-09-22 00:00:00

Case Management Statement

9/18/2017: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

9/7/2017: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - Minute order entered: 2017-04-13 00:00:00

4/13/2017: Minute Order - Minute order entered: 2017-04-13 00:00:00

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Miscellaneous-Other

4/11/2017: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Miscellaneous-Other

Minute Order - Minute order entered: 2017-04-07 00:00:00

4/7/2017: Minute Order - Minute order entered: 2017-04-07 00:00:00

Minute Order - Minute order entered: 2017-03-24 00:00:00

3/24/2017: Minute Order - Minute order entered: 2017-03-24 00:00:00

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Miscellaneous-Other

3/23/2017: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Miscellaneous-Other

Minute Order - Minute order entered: 2017-03-22 00:00:00

3/22/2017: Minute Order - Minute order entered: 2017-03-22 00:00:00

Minute Order - Minute order entered: 2017-03-09 00:00:00

3/9/2017: Minute Order - Minute order entered: 2017-03-09 00:00:00

Minute Order - Minute order entered: 2017-03-06 00:00:00

3/6/2017: Minute Order - Minute order entered: 2017-03-06 00:00:00

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Miscellaneous-Other

3/2/2017: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Miscellaneous-Other

Minute Order - Minute order entered: 2017-02-24 00:00:00

2/24/2017: Minute Order - Minute order entered: 2017-02-24 00:00:00

Minute Order - Minute order entered: 2017-01-24 00:00:00

1/24/2017: Minute Order - Minute order entered: 2017-01-24 00:00:00

Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter

1/24/2017: Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Ntc to Reptr/Mon to Prep Transcrpt

1/23/2017: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Ntc to Reptr/Mon to Prep Transcrpt

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Notice of Designation of Record

12/21/2016: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Notice of Designation of Record

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Motion

12/20/2016: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Motion

Notice of Ruling

12/19/2016: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - Minute order entered: 2016-12-13 00:00:00

12/13/2016: Minute Order - Minute order entered: 2016-12-13 00:00:00

Brief

11/28/2016: Brief

Brief

11/28/2016: Brief

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Notice

11/14/2016: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Notice

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Ntc to Attorney re Notice of Appeal

11/9/2016: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Ntc to Attorney re Notice of Appeal

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Notice

11/8/2016: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Notice

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Notice of Appeal

11/7/2016: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Notice of Appeal

Minute Order - Minute order entered: 2016-10-27 00:00:00

10/27/2016: Minute Order - Minute order entered: 2016-10-27 00:00:00

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Motion to Strike

10/27/2016: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Motion to Strike

Notice of Ruling

10/24/2016: Notice of Ruling

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Notice

10/20/2016: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Notice

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Notice

10/19/2016: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Notice

Notice of Entry of Judgment

10/19/2016: Notice of Entry of Judgment

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Opposition

10/18/2016: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Opposition

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Cross-Compl fld - Summons Issued

10/18/2016: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Cross-Compl fld - Summons Issued

Cross-Complaint

10/18/2016: Cross-Complaint

Minute Order - Minute order entered: 2016-10-11 00:00:00

10/11/2016: Minute Order - Minute order entered: 2016-10-11 00:00:00

Case Management Statement

10/5/2016: Case Management Statement

Judgment

9/29/2016: Judgment

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Order

9/29/2016: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Order

Minute Order - Minute order entered: 2016-09-15 00:00:00

9/15/2016: Minute Order - Minute order entered: 2016-09-15 00:00:00

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Reply

9/8/2016: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Reply

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Motion to Quash

9/8/2016: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Motion to Quash

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Declaration

9/8/2016: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Declaration