LILLIAN CARTER ET AL VS UNIVERSAL STUDIOS INC ET AL

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/03/2015
  • DocketSummons; Filed by null

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2015
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2015
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Nekaya Carter (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2015
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES (PERSONAL INJURY) 1. WRONGFUL DEATH/NEGLIGENCE; ETC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2015
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by LILLIAN CARTER, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS THE (Plaintiff); ESTATE OF TERRY CARTER (Plaintiff); Lillian Carter (Plaintiff) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2015
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2015
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint; Filed by Lillian Carter (Plaintiff); Nekaya Carter (Plaintiff); Crystal Carter (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2015
  • DocketAMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2015
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2015
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2015
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2015
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Lillian Carter (Plaintiff); Nekaya Carter (Plaintiff); Crystal Carter (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2015
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by ESTATE OF TERRY CARTER (Plaintiff); Lillian Carter (Plaintiff); Nekaya Carter (Plaintiff) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2015
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2015
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2015
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by LILLIAN CARTER, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS THE (Plaintiff); ESTATE OF TERRY CARTER (Plaintiff); Lillian Carter (Plaintiff) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2015
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2015
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by LILLIAN CARTER, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS THE (Plaintiff); ESTATE OF TERRY CARTER (Plaintiff); Lillian Carter (Plaintiff) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2015
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2015
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2015
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2015
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2015
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by LILLIAN CARTER, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS THE (Plaintiff); ESTATE OF TERRY CARTER (Plaintiff); Lillian Carter (Plaintiff) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2015
  • DocketMotion (MOTION TO TRANSFER COMPLICATED PERSONAL INJURY CASE TO INDEPENDENT CALENDAR COURT AND ORDER ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2015
  • DocketMOTION/ OPPOSITION/ STIPULATION TO TRANSFER COMPLICATED PERSONAL INJURY CASE TO INDEPENDENT CALENDAR COURT AND ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2015
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO TRANSFER COMPLICATED PERSONAL INJURY CASE TO INDEPENDENT CALENDAR COURT AND ORDER; Filed by LILLIAN CARTER, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS THE (Plaintiff); ESTATE OF TERRY CARTER (Plaintiff); Lillian Carter (Plaintiff) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2015
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2015
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2015
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by LILLIAN CARTER, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS THE (Plaintiff); ESTATE OF TERRY CARTER (Plaintiff); Lillian Carter (Plaintiff) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2015
  • DocketDEFENDANTS' DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT AS TO ANDRE YOUNG AND O'SHEA JACKSON, SR.; Filed by ANDRE "DR. DRE" YOUNG (Defendant); O'Shea "Ice Cube" Jackson, Sr. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2015
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE COMPLAINT OF PLAINTIFFS AS TO PRETTY BIRD PICTURES, INC.; Filed by PRETTYBIRD PICTURES, INC. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2015
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT OF PLAINTIFFS AS TO PRETTY BIRD PICTURES, INC.; Filed by PRETTYBIRD PICTURES, INC. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2015
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STRIKE COMPLAINT OF PLAINTIFFS AS TO PRETTY BIRD PICTURES, INC.; Filed by PRETTYBIRD PICTURES, INC. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2015
  • DocketDEFENDANTS' REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT AS TO ANDRE YOUNG AND O'SHEA JACKSON, SR.; Filed by O'Shea "Ice Cube" Jackson, Sr. (Defendant); Andre, Dr. Dre Young (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2015
  • DocketMotion to Strike; Filed by Defendant/Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2015
  • DocketDemurrer; Filed by Andre, Dr. Dre Young (Defendant); O'shea Sr. Ice Cube Jackson (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2015
  • DocketDemurrer; Filed by Defendant/Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2015
  • DocketNOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER BY DEFENDANT PRETTY BIRD PICTURES, INC. TO COMPLAINT OF PLAINTIFFS LILLIAN CARTER, NEKAYA CARTER, AND CRYSTAL CARTER; SUPPORTING MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2015
  • DocketDEFENDANTS O'SHEA JACKSON, SR. AND ANDRE YOUNG'S REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT; DECLARATION OF ALEXANDER H. COTE IN SUPPORT THEREOF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2015
  • DocketREQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT PRETTY BIRD PICTURES, INC.'S DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE COMPLAINT OF PLAINTIFFS LILLIAN CARTER, NEKAYA CARTER, AND CRYSTAL CARTER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2015
  • DocketDEFENDANTS O'SHEA JACKSON, SR. AND ANDRE YOUNG'S NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2015
  • DocketDEFENDANT PRETTY BIRD PICTURES, INC.'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE COMPLAINT OF PLAINTIFFS LILLIAN CARTER, NEKAYA CARTER, AND CRYSTAL CARTER; ETC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2015
  • DocketRequest for Judicial Notice (IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT PRETTY BIRD PICTURES, INC.'S DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE COMPLAINT OF PLAINTIFFS LILLIAN CARTER, NEKAYA CARTER, AND CRYSTAL CARTER ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2015
  • DocketRequest for Judicial Notice (IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2015
  • DocketMotion to Strike (COMPLAINT OF PLAINTIFFS LILLIAN CARTER, NEKAYA CARTER, AND CRYSTAL CARTER ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2015
  • DocketDemurrer (NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2015
  • DocketDemurrer (BY DEFENDANT PRETTY BIRD PICTURES, INC. TO COMPLAINT OF PLAINTIFFS LILLIAN CARTER, NEKAYA CARTER, AND CRYSTAL CARTER ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2015
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by ESTATE OF TERRY CARTER (Plaintiff); Lillian Carter (Plaintiff); Nekaya Carter (Plaintiff) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2015
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2015
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/14/2015
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by ESTATE OF TERRY CARTER (Plaintiff); Lillian Carter (Plaintiff); Nekaya Carter (Plaintiff) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/14/2015
  • DocketNtc and Acknowledgement of Receipt; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/14/2015
  • DocketNOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT - CIVIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2015
  • DocketProof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2015
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by PRETTYBIRD PICTURES, INC. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2015
  • DocketProof of Service; Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2015
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S ANSWER TO THE COMPLAINT OF PLAINTIFF ON BEHALF OF TAM'S 21 ROSEWOOD, INC., DBA: TAM'S BURGERS NO. 21 ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS TAM'S BURGERS; Filed by TAM'S BURGERS (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2015
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Tam's 21 Rosewood, Inc. (Defendant); Tam's Burgers No. 21 (Legacy Party)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2015
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL AS TO TAM'S BURGERS; Filed by TAM'S BURGERS (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2015
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by TAM'S BURGERS (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2015
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint; Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2015
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2015
  • DocketANSWER TO THE COMPLAINT OF PLAINTIFFSS LILLIAN CARTER ET. AL. ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANT TAM'S 21 ROSE WOOD, INC., DBA TAM'S BURGERS NO.21 ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS TAM'S BURGERS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2015
  • DocketDEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2015
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS PENDING OUTCOME OF CRIMINAL CASE; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF LOYST P. FLETCHER; [PROPOSED] ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2015
  • DocketMotion; Filed by MARION "SUGE" KNIGHT (Cross-Complainant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2015
  • DocketMotion (TO STAY PROCEEDINGS PENDING OUTCOME OF CRIMINAL CASE ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2015
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS PENDING OUTCOME OF CRIMINAL CASE; Filed by Marion Suge Knight (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2015
  • DocketDemurrer (TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2015
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT AS TO NBCUNIVERSAL, LLC; Filed by NBCUNIVERSAL, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2015
  • DocketDemurrer; Filed by NBCUNIVERSAL, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2015
  • DocketDEFENDANT NBCUNIVERSAL, LLC'S NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2015
  • DocketOpposition Document (TO MOTION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2015
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS; Filed by ESTATE OF TERRY CARTER (Plaintiff); Lillian Carter (Plaintiff); Nekaya Carter (Plaintiff) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2015
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2015
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S REPLY TO OPPOSITION OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS PENDING OUTCOME OF CRIMINAL CASE AS TO MARION KNIGHT; Filed by Marion Suge Knight (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2015
  • DocketREPLY TO OPPOSITION OF DEFENDANT MARION KNIGHT'S MOTION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS PENDING OUTCOME OF CRIMINAL CASE; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2015
  • DocketReply to Opposition (OF DEFENDANT MARION KNIGHT'S MOTION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS PENDING OUTCOME OF CRIMINAL CASE; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2015
  • DocketMinute Order ((DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS PENDING OUTCOME OF CRIMINAL CASE)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2015
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2015
  • DocketORDER RE MOTION OF DEFENDANT MARION KNIGHT TO STAY ACTION PENDING OUTCOME OF CRIMINAL CASE; Filed by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2015
  • DocketOrder (RE MOTION OF DEFENDANT, MARION KNIGHT, TO STAY ACTION PENDING OUTCOME OF CRIMINAL CASE ); Filed by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2015
  • DocketORDER RE: MOTION OF DEFENDANT, MARION KNIGHT, TO STAY ACTION PENDING OUTCOME OF CRIMINAL CASE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2015
  • Docketat 01:30 pm in Department 93, Howard L. Halm, Presiding; MOTION - STAY PROCEEDINGS - Denied

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2015
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 93; Hearing on Motion for Stay of Proceedings (MOTION - STAY PROCEEDINGS; Denied) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2015
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2015
  • DocketOrder of Transfer (MOTION TO TRANSFER COMPLICATED PERSONAL INJURY CASE TO INDEPENDENT CALENDAR COURT AND ORDER *TRANSFERRED TO DEPT B, COMPTON*); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2015
  • DocketMinute Order ((COURT ORDER RE MOTION TO TRANSFER COMPLICATED PERSONAL INJURY CASE TO INDEPENDENT COURT AND ORDER)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2015
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO TRANSFER COMPLICATED PERSONAL INJURY CASE TO INDEPENDENT CALENDAR COURT AND ORDER TO THE COMPTON COURTHOUSE, DEPARTMENT B; Filed by Lillian Carter (Plaintiff); Nekaya Carter (Plaintiff); Crystal Carter (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2015
  • DocketMOTION / OPPOSITION / STIPULATION TO TRANSFER COMPLICATED PERSONAL INJURY CASE TO INDEPENDENT CALENDAR COURT AND ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2015
  • Docketat 03:30 pm in Department 93, Howard L. Halm, Presiding; Motion to Transfer (*TRANSFERRED TO DEPT B, COMPTON*) - Transferred to different departmnt

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2015
  • Docketat 3:30 PM in Department 93; Hearing on Motion to Transfer (Motion to Transfer; Transferred to different departmnt) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/09/2015
  • Docketat 4:00 PM in Department B; Court Order (Court Order; Court Makes Order) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2015
  • DocketMinute Order ((COURT ORDER)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2015
  • Docketat 4:00 PM in Department B; Court Order (Court Order; Court Makes Order) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2015
  • DocketNOTICE OF RULING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2015
  • DocketNotice; Filed by PRETTYBIRD PICTURES, INC. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2015
  • DocketMinute Order ((STATUS CONFERENCE; DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS PENDING OUTCOME OF CRIMINAL CASE)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2015
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department B; Hearing on Motion for Stay of Proceedings (Motion-Stay Proceedings; Off Calendar) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/30/2015
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE TO COMPLAINT OF PLAINTIFFS AS TO PRETTY BIRD PICTURES, INC.; Filed by PRETTYBIRD PICTURES, INC. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less