This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/21/2019 at 07:41:43 (UTC).

LILAINE BASIWANG CAMU

Case Summary

On 04/20/2015 LILAINE BASIWANG CAMU was filed as an Other - Name Change lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GERALD ROSENBERG. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5420

  • Filing Date:

    04/20/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other - Name Change

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Santa Monica Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

GERALD ROSENBERG

 

Party Details

Petitioner

CAMU LILAINE BASIWANG

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/20/2015
  • at 08:30 AM in Department K; Order to Show Cause Re: Name Change (Petition for Name Change; Pet Granted/Order Signed & Filed) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2015
  • Ord, Change/Amend/Correct Name; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2015
  • Ord, Change/Amend/Correct Name; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2015
  • Proof of Publication; Filed by LILAINE BASIWANG CAMU (Petitioner); LILAINE BASIWANG CAMU (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2015
  • Proof of Publication; Filed by Petitioner & Petitioner in Pro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2015
  • at 08:30 AM in Department K; Order to Show Cause Re: Name Change (Petition for Name Change; Matter continued) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2015
  • at 08:30 am in Department WEK, Gerald Rosenberg, Presiding; Petition for Name Change - Matter continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2015
  • at 08:30 AM in Department K; Order to Show Cause Re: Name Change (Petition for Name Change; Continued) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2015
  • at 08:30 am in Department WEK, Gerald Rosenberg, Presiding; Petition for Name Change - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2015
  • Miscellaneous-Other (NAME CHANGE CRIMINAL HISTORY ASSESSMENT ); Filed by Petitioner & Petitioner in Pro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 06/16/2015
  • Proof of Publication; Filed by LILAINE BASIWANG CAMU (Petitioner); LILAINE BASIWANG CAMU (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2015
  • Proof of Publication; Filed by Petitioner & Petitioner in Pro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2015
  • Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by LILAINE BASIWANG CAMU (Petitioner); LILAINE BASIWANG CAMU (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2015
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by LILAINE BASIWANG CAMU (Petitioner); LILAINE BASIWANG CAMU (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2015
  • Petn for Change of Name filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2015
  • Ord-App/Waiver Court Fees & Costs; Filed by Petitioner & Petitioner in Pro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2015
  • Petition for Change of Name; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2015
  • Order to Show Cause

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2015
  • Appl, Waiver of Court Fees & Costs; Filed by Petitioner & Petitioner in Pro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2015
  • Order to Show Cause; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.