This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/13/2019 at 01:33:00 (UTC).

LIFTECH ELEVATOR SERVICES, INC. VS PLAZA TOWERS CONDOMINIUM

Case Summary

On 10/27/2016 LIFTECH ELEVATOR SERVICES, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against PLAZA TOWERS CONDOMINIUM. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GERALD ROSENBERG. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6625

  • Filing Date:

    10/27/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

GERALD ROSENBERG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LIFTECH ELEVATOR SERVICES INC.

Defendant

PLAZA TOWERS CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STACY PETER L.

Defendant Attorney

WOLF RIFKIN SHAPIRO SCHULMAN & RABKIN

Other Attorneys

DASOVICH CAROLINE L.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

10/27/2016: Complaint

Summons

10/27/2016: Summons

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/27/2016: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Unknown

1/18/2017: Unknown

Other -

1/30/2017: Other -

Unknown

1/30/2017: Unknown

Case Management Statement

1/30/2017: Case Management Statement

Unknown

1/30/2017: Unknown

Minute Order

2/14/2017: Minute Order

Summons

3/20/2017: Summons

Answer

3/20/2017: Answer

Cross-Complaint

3/20/2017: Cross-Complaint

Unknown

4/18/2017: Unknown

Minute Order

5/1/2017: Minute Order

Minute Order

12/6/2017: Minute Order

Unknown

12/6/2017: Unknown

Declaration

12/6/2017: Declaration

Unknown

12/7/2017: Unknown

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/13/2019
  • Notice of Settlement; Filed by LIFTECH ELEVATOR SERVICES, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • Notice (of case reassignment and order); Filed by LIFTECH ELEVATOR SERVICES, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department K; Ex-Parte Proceedings - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • at 08:30 am in Department WEK, Gerald Rosenberg, Presiding; Ex-Parte Application (TO CONTINUE TRIAL) - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • Notice of Ruling; Filed by PLAZA TOWERS CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION, INC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • Notice Of Association of Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • Association of Attorney; Filed by LIFTECH ELEVATOR SERVICES, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • Notice of Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • Ex-Parte Application; Filed by PLAZA TOWERS CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION, INC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
30 More Docket Entries
  • 01/30/2017
  • Notice (OF POSTING JURY FEES ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2017
  • Notice (OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2017
  • Statement-Case Management; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2017
  • Notice (OF ERRATA ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2017
  • Notice; Filed by LIFTECH ELEVATOR SERVICES, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2016
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2016
  • Summons Filed; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2016
  • Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by LIFTECH ELEVATOR SERVICES, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2016
  • Summons; Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PLAZA TOWER CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION INC is a litigant

Latest cases where LIFTECH ELEVATOR SERVICES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DASOVICH CAROLINE L. ESQ.