This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/02/2019 at 02:04:52 (UTC).

LI JUAN HUANG ET AL VS MONTEREY PARK GARDEN LLC ET AL

Case Summary

On 09/10/2015 LI JUAN HUANG filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against MONTEREY PARK GARDEN LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are WILLIAM D. STEWART and HOWARD L. HALM. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4166

  • Filing Date:

    09/10/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

WILLIAM D. STEWART

HOWARD L. HALM

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

HUANG LI JUAN

ZHOU JUN LIAN

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 THROUGH 50

MONTEREY PARK GARDEN LLC

RIDAN INC.

RIDAN INC

RIDAN INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

PANISH SHEA & BOYLE LLP

LAW OFFICES OF DANIEL H. HENG

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

LEAVITT SCOTT M. ESQ

DANIELS FINE ISRAEL SCHONBUCH & LEBOVITS

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. NEGLIGENCE; ETC

9/10/2015: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. NEGLIGENCE; ETC

SUMMONS

9/10/2015: SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

9/22/2015: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

9/24/2015: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

9/29/2015: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT

10/27/2015: DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF HEARING ON DEMURRER OF DEFENDANTS TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT

10/27/2015: NOTICE OF HEARING ON DEMURRER OF DEFENDANTS TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT

STIPULATION TO DISMISS CAUSES OF ACTION NOS. 2 THROUGH 7 IN PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT AND STRIKE CERTAIN ALLEGATIONS IN THE COMPLAINT

2/5/2016: STIPULATION TO DISMISS CAUSES OF ACTION NOS. 2 THROUGH 7 IN PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT AND STRIKE CERTAIN ALLEGATIONS IN THE COMPLAINT

ORDER TRANSFERRING COMPLICATED PERSONAL INJURY (P1) CASE TO INDEPENDENT CALENDAR (IC) COURT

2/17/2016: ORDER TRANSFERRING COMPLICATED PERSONAL INJURY (P1) CASE TO INDEPENDENT CALENDAR (IC) COURT

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/17/2016
  • at 08:30 AM in Department A; Unknown Event Type - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2016
  • at 08:30 AM in Department A; Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Advanced to a Previous Date) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2016
  • at 10:30 AM in Department A; Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Advanced to a Previous Date) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2016
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Li Juan Huang (Plaintiff); Jun Lian Zhou (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2016
  • Notice of Ruling; Filed by Li Juan Huang (Plaintiff); Jun Lian Zhou (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2016
  • at 1:30 PM in Department A; Court Order - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2016
  • Notice of Settlement; Filed by Li Juan Huang (Plaintiff); Jun Lian Zhou (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2016
  • Notice of Ruling; Filed by Monterey Park Garden, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2016
  • at 08:30 AM in Department A; Hearing on Motion for Order - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2016
  • Declaration; Filed by Li Juan Huang (Plaintiff); Jun Lian Zhou (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
29 More Docket Entries
  • 09/24/2015
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2015
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2015
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2015
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2015
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2015
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2015
  • COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. NEGLIGENCE; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2015
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2015
  • Complaint; Filed by Li Juan Huang (Plaintiff); Jun Lian Zhou (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2015
  • Notice of Hearing on Demurrer; Filed by Monterey Park Garden, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.