Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/05/2020 at 15:24:45 (UTC).

LHR, INC., ASSIGNEE OF BANK OF AMERICA VS HOA D. NGO

Case Summary

On 03/12/2009 LHR, INC , ASSIGNEE OF BANK OF AMERICA filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against HOA D NGO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MURRAY GROSS and KENNETH R. FREEMAN. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9610

  • Filing Date:

    03/12/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MURRAY GROSS

KENNETH R. FREEMAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

LHR INC.

LHR INC. ASSIGNEE OF BANK OF AMERICA

Defendants and Respondents

DANGO HOA

DOES 1-10

NGO HOA D.

NGO HOA D. AKA HOA DANGO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

BOOSKA STEVEN A. ESQ.

BOOSKA STEVEN ALFRED

 

Court Documents

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION RE INTEREST

5/1/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION RE INTEREST

Application for and Renewal of Judgment

5/1/2019: Application for and Renewal of Judgment

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT

5/2/2019: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT

Declaration - DECLARATION OF BRAD ELLIOT IN SUPPORT OF AMENDING JUDGMENT

9/24/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION OF BRAD ELLIOT IN SUPPORT OF AMENDING JUDGMENT

Declaration - DECLARATION OF STEVEN A. BOOSKA IN SUPPORT OF AMENDING JUDGMENT

9/24/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION OF STEVEN A. BOOSKA IN SUPPORT OF AMENDING JUDGMENT

Memorandum of Points & Authorities

9/24/2020: Memorandum of Points & Authorities

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS

10/4/2013: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS

MEMO OF COSTS AFTER JUDGEMENT, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST -

10/4/2013: MEMO OF COSTS AFTER JUDGEMENT, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST -

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS

4/21/2017: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/06/2021
  • Hearing04/06/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Amend Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketDeclaration (of Brad Elliot In Support of Amending Judgment); Filed by LHR, Inc., Assignee Of Bank Of America (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by LHR, Inc., Assignee Of Bank Of America (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketMemorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by LHR, Inc., Assignee Of Bank Of America (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketDeclaration (of Steven A. Booska in Support of Amending Judgment); Filed by LHR, Inc., Assignee Of Bank Of America (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketMotion to Amend Judgment; Filed by LHR, Inc., Assignee Of Bank Of America (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • DocketNotice (Notice of Renewal of Judgment); Filed by LHR, Inc., Assignee Of Bank Of America (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • DocketDeclaration (Declaration re interest); Filed by LHR, Inc., Assignee Of Bank Of America (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest; Filed by LHR, Inc., Assignee Of Bank Of America (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • DocketApplication for and Renewal of Judgment; Filed by LHR, Inc., Assignee Of Bank Of America (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 07/06/2009
  • DocketDefault Judgment; Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2009
  • DocketPartial Dismissal(not entire case) (WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS DOES 1-10 ); Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2009
  • Docketat 08:30 am in Department 64, Kenneth R. Freeman, Presiding; Conference-Case Management - Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2009
  • DocketStatement-Case Management; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2009
  • DocketDefault Entered (HOA D. NGO AKA HOA DANGO ); Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2009
  • DocketProof of Service; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2009
  • DocketNotice-Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2009
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2009
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2009
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by LHR, Inc., Assignee Of Bank Of America (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC409610    Hearing Date: April 6, 2021    Dept: 26

IN ORDER TO IMPLEMENT PHYSICAL DISTANCING AND UNTIL FURTHER NOTICE, THE COURT STRONGLY ENCOURAGES ALL COUNSEL AND ALL PARTIES TO APPEAR REMOTELY FOR NON-TRIAL AND NON-EVIDENTIARY MATTERS, INCLUDING THIS MOTION.

Superior Court of California

County of Los Angeles

Department 26

lhr, inc., assignee of bank of america,

Plaintiff,

v.

hoa d. ngo, a.k.a. HOA DANGO,

Defendant.

Case No.: BC409610

Hearing Date: April 6, 2021

[TENTATIVE] order RE:

Plaintiff/judgment creditor’s MOTION TO AMEND JUDGMENT TO CHANGE PLAINTIFF’S NAME

Background

On March 12, 2009, Plaintiff LHR, Inc., Assignee of Bank of America (“LHR”) filed this collection action against defendant Hoa D. Hgo aka Hoa Dango (“Judgment Debtor”). On July 6, 2009 judgment was entered in favor of LHR in the sum of $28,916.79 principal, $1,032.30 in prejudgment interest, $1,257.50 in attorney’s fees, and $395.00 in costs for a total of $31,601.59. (Booska Decl. ¶ 3.) On May 1, 2019, the judgment was renewed in the amount of $31,601.59 damages plus $375.00 in costs after judgment, $30,845.90 in interest after judgment, plus a $30.00 court fee, for a total of $62,852.49. (Booska Decl. ¶ 3.)

On September 24, 2020, LHR filed the instant motion to amend the judgment to change Plaintiff’s name to the current assignee, Pharus Funding, LLC, Successor in Interest to LHR, Inc. No opposition has been filed.

Discussion

Pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure § 187, a trial court has jurisdiction to modify a judgment. Section 187 grants to every court the power to use all means to carry its jurisdiction into effect, even if those processes are not set out in the code. Section 187 states: “When jurisdiction is, by the Constitution or this Code, or by any other statute, conferred on a Court or judicial officer, all the means necessary to carry it into effect are also given; and in the exercise of this jurisdiction, if the course of proceeding be not specifically pointed out by this Code or the statute, any suitable process or mode of proceeding may be adopted which may appear most conformable to the spirit of this code.” (CCP § 187.)

As stated by both LHR’s Counsel and the Debt Portfolio Manager for Pharus Funding LLC, the instant obligation and judgment were assigned from LHR to Millennium Financial Group, LLC on November 26, 2012. (Booska Decl. ¶ 4; Elliot Decl. Ex. A.) On June 1, 2017, the instant obligation and judgment were assigned from Millennium Financial Group, LLC to Pharus Funding, LLC. (Booska Decl. ¶ 4; Elliot Decl. Ex. B.) As the obligation and judgment have been assigned to Pharus Funding, LLC, Pharus is the proper judgment creditor.

Conclusion

Accordingly, LHR’s unopposed motion to change the name of Plaintiff on the Judgment is granted. The Judgment entered on July 6, 20009 and renewed May 1, 2019 is amended to reflect Pharus Funding, LLC, Successor in Interest to LHR, Inc. as Plaintiff and Judgment Creditor.

Moving Party is to provide notice and file proof of service of such.

DATED: April 6, 2021 ___________________________

Elaine Lu

Judge of the Superior Court

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DANG HOA LE is a litigant

Latest cases where LHR INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Steven A Booska