Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/07/2019 at 13:40:35 (UTC).

LEVIN & MARGOLIN VS MICHAEL BUGH

Case Summary

On 06/10/2016 LEVIN MARGOLIN filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against MICHAEL BUGH. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is CRAIG D. KARLAN. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5977

  • Filing Date:

    06/10/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Santa Monica Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CRAIG D. KARLAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LEVIN & MARGOLIN

Defendant

BUGH MICHAEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SKLAN JEFFREY

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/29/2016
  • Notice-Settlement; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2016
  • Notice of Settlement; Filed by Levin & Margolin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2016
  • at 08:30 AM in Department N; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Settled) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2016
  • at 08:30 am in Department WEN, Craig D. Karlan, Presiding; Conference-Case Management - Settled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2016
  • Case Management Statement; Filed by Levin & Margolin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2016
  • Statement-Case Management; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2016
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Levin & Margolin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2016
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2016
  • Summons; Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2016
  • Summons Filed; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2016
  • Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by Levin & Margolin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LEVIN & MARGOLIN is a litigant