Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/08/2019 at 15:05:56 (UTC).

LEVIN & MARGOLIN VS MARCIA NAZARETH COTRIM BERGMAN

Case Summary

On 07/07/2015 LEVIN MARGOLIN filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against MARCIA NAZARETH COTRIM BERGMAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is NANCY L. NEWMAN. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4422

  • Filing Date:

    07/07/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Santa Monica Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

NANCY L. NEWMAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LEVIN & MARGOLIN

Defendant

BERGMAN MARCIA NAZARETH COTRIM

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SKLAN JEFFREY

 

Court Documents

Declaration

7/18/2018: Declaration

Request for Dismissal

7/18/2018: Request for Dismissal

Judgment

7/27/2018: Judgment

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/27/2018
  • at 09:00 AM in Department P; Status Conference (Status Conference; Judgment) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • at 09:00 am in Department WEP, Nancy L. Newman, Presiding; Status Conference (RE: DEFAULT) - Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • Default Judgment; Filed by Levin & Margolin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • Default Judgment (TOTAL $48,675.44 ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • Declaration (OF KSENYA G. KOGAN REGARDING DEFAULT JUDGMENT ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • Partial Dismissal (with Prejudice) (DOES 1 TO 10 ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • Declaration; Filed by Levin & Margolin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • Partial Dismissal (with Prejudice); Filed by Levin & Margolin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • Declaration Ksenya G. Kogan

    Read MoreRead Less
54 More Docket Entries
  • 12/18/2015
  • at 09:00 AM in Department P; (Order to Show Cause; OSC Discharged) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2015
  • at 09:00 am in Department WEP, Nancy L. Newman, Presiding; Order to Show Cause (RE SANCTIONS FOR FAILURE TO APPEARAT CMC ON 10/20/15) - OSC Discharged

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2015
  • Response; Filed by Levin & Margolin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2015
  • Response (DECLARATION OF KAREN L. DALES ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2015
  • at 08:30 AM in Department P; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Court Makes Order) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2015
  • at 08:30 am in Department WEP, Nancy L. Newman, Presiding; Conference-Case Management - Court Makes Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2015
  • Summons Filed; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2015
  • Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2015
  • Summons; Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2015
  • Complaint; Filed by Levin & Margolin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LEVIN & MARGOLIN is a litigant