Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/07/2021 at 17:15:57 (UTC).

LEVIN & MARGOLIN VS HANNAH VU

Case Summary

On 02/20/2014 LEVIN MARGOLIN filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against HANNAH VU. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RICHARD FRUIN. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6986

  • Filing Date:

    02/20/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

RICHARD FRUIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

LEVIN & MARGOLIN

BURTON MARK SENK

SENK BURTON MARK

Defendant and Respondent

VU HANNAH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

LEVIN & MARGOLIN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/04/2014
  • DocketAssociation of Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2014
  • DocketNOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2014
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2014
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2014
  • Docketat 00:00 AM in Department 15; Non-Appearance Case Review (Non-Appearance (Case Review); Dismissal-Default-Appeal) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2014
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2014
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2014
  • DocketDeclaration; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2014
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2014
  • DocketJudgment; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 07/11/2014
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2014
  • DocketDECLARATION OF LIONEL P. LEVIN IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2014
  • DocketJUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2014
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2014
  • DocketDefault Entered; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2014
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2014
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2014
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Burton Mark Senk (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2014
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-CONTRACT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2014
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LEVIN & MARGOLIN is a litigant