Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/09/2019 at 03:22:37 (UTC).

LEVENSON, ELIZABETH VS DABROWSKI, JOHN

Case Summary

On 10/03/2016 LEVENSON, ELIZABETH filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against DABROWSKI, JOHN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3591

  • Filing Date:

    10/03/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Chatsworth Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

LEVENSON ELIZABETH

Respondent

DABROWSKI JOHN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

SPERLING MITCHELL

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/03/2017
  • Notice - Withdrawal of Attorney of Record (- On Behalf of: Respondent: Dabrowski, John ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2017
  • Notice - Withdrawal of Attorney of Record (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Levenson, Elizabeth ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2017
  • Notice - Entry of Judgment (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Levenson, Elizabeth - Filed and Entered on 2017-04-25 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2017
  • Declaration - Default or Uncontested Judgment FL230 (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Levenson, Elizabeth - Filed and Entered on 2017-04-25 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2017
  • Judgment (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Levenson, Elizabeth - Filed and Entered on 2017-04-25 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2017
  • Judgment Package Received - Stipulated (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Levenson, Elizabeth ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2017
  • Declaration - Default FL170; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • Appearance, Stipulations and Waivers (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Levenson, Elizabeth ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • Stipulation - Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure (- On Behalf of: Respondent: Dabrowski, John ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • Judgment Package Received - Stipulated (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Levenson, Elizabeth ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 12/15/2016
  • Proof of Service - Mail (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Levenson, Elizabeth - Service Date on 2016-12-15 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2016
  • Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Levenson, Elizabeth ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2016
  • Notice - Unavailability of Counsel (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Levenson, Elizabeth - Filed and Entered on 2016-11-30 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2016
  • Proof of Service of Summons (Incomplete POS--Time of Service - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Levenson, Elizabeth ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2016
  • Response (- On Behalf of: Respondent: Dabrowski, John - Filed and Entered on 2016-10-19 ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2016
  • Milestone 2 Completed (Entered Date: 10-27-16 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2016
  • Milestone 1 Completed (Entered Date: 11-10-16 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2016
  • Notice (of Case Assignment to DEPT F46 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2016
  • Petition (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Levenson, Elizabeth ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2016
  • Summons (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Levenson, Elizabeth ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less