This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/02/2019 at 09:05:48 (UTC).

LESTER ARAUZ VS MOON UP IN THE SKY INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 11/06/2015 LESTER ARAUZ filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against MOON UP IN THE SKY INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0409

  • Filing Date:

    11/06/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

ARAUZ LESTER

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 TO 25

MOON BRIAN

MOON UP IN THE SKY INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF KUSION & CAMPANA

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

ZURAWSKI JAMES P. ESQ.

SERAFINI EVELINA M. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

11/6/2015: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

SUMMONS

11/6/2015: SUMMONS

CIVIL DEPOSIT

2/5/2016: CIVIL DEPOSIT

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

2/5/2016: NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

2/5/2016: DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

2/5/2016: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME

6/20/2016: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME

CIVIL DEPOSIT

11/16/2016: CIVIL DEPOSIT

Minute Order

4/21/2017: Minute Order

Minute Order

5/8/2017: Minute Order

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

6/2/2017: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/02/2017
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2017
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 93; Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Order of Dismissal) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2017
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2017
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 93; Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; No Appearance) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2017
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2016
  • CIVIL DEPOSIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2016
  • Miscellaneous-Other; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2016
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2016
  • Notice; Filed by Moon Up in the Sky, Inc. (Defendant); Brian Moon (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 02/05/2016
  • Receipt; Filed by Moon Up in the Sky, Inc. (Defendant); Brian Moon (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2016
  • DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2016
  • CIVIL DEPOSIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2016
  • NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2016
  • Notice; Filed by Moon Up in the Sky, Inc. (Defendant); Brian Moon (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2016
  • Answer; Filed by Moon Up in the Sky, Inc. (Defendant); Brian Moon (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2016
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2015
  • Complaint; Filed by Lester Arauz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2015
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2015
  • COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MOON UP IN THE SKY INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ZURAWSKI JAMES P. ESQ.