This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/30/2019 at 02:47:33 (UTC).

LESLIE REDDEN VS MARION HUGH KNIGHT JR ET AL

Case Summary

On 06/04/2015 LESLIE REDDEN filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against MARION HUGH KNIGHT JR. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are HOWARD L. HALM and CHRISTOPHER K. LUI. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4258

  • Filing Date:

    06/04/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

HOWARD L. HALM

CHRISTOPHER K. LUI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

REDDEN LESLIE

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1-50

KNIGHT MARION HUGH JR.

WILLIAMS MICAH SIERRA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

LAYFIELD & WALLACE APC

LAYFIELD & BARRETT APC

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

LAW OFFICES OF LOYST P. FLETCHER

BRIGGS WILLIAM J. II ESQ.

CULPEPPER LAW GROUP

GURVITZ MATTHEW MARSHALL

CULPEPPER THADDEUS JULIAN

BRIGGS WILLIAM JOSEPH

FLETCHER LOYST PATRICK

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

8/7/2018: Minute Order

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

10/29/2018: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Minute Order

2/6/2019: Minute Order

Minute Order

3/14/2019: Minute Order

Proof of Service by Mail

4/30/2019: Proof of Service by Mail

Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

4/30/2019: Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

ORDER RE: MOTION OF DEFENDANT, MARION KNIGHT, TO STAY ACTION PENDING OUTCOME OF CRIMINAL CASE

9/16/2015: ORDER RE: MOTION OF DEFENDANT, MARION KNIGHT, TO STAY ACTION PENDING OUTCOME OF CRIMINAL CASE

Minute Order

9/16/2015: Minute Order

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME

12/15/2015: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

2/25/2016: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OR OTHER CONTACT INFORMATION

8/17/2016: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OR OTHER CONTACT INFORMATION

DECLARATION OF MELISSA C. MCLAUGHLIN IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO STAY

8/30/2016: DECLARATION OF MELISSA C. MCLAUGHLIN IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO STAY

PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT MICAH SIERRA WILLIAMS' MOTION TO STAY

10/3/2016: PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT MICAH SIERRA WILLIAMS' MOTION TO STAY

REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO STAY

10/7/2016: REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO STAY

Minute Order

10/17/2016: Minute Order

Minute Order

6/22/2017: Minute Order

NOTICE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE, STATUS CONFERENCE, AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY STAY SHOULD NOT BE LIFTED

6/23/2017: NOTICE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE, STATUS CONFERENCE, AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY STAY SHOULD NOT BE LIFTED

NOTICE OF (A) PENDENCY OF CASE UNDER CHAPTER 11 OF THE FEDERAL BANKRUPTCY CODE; ETC

9/26/2017: NOTICE OF (A) PENDENCY OF CASE UNDER CHAPTER 11 OF THE FEDERAL BANKRUPTCY CODE; ETC

30 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/17/2019
  • Proof of Service by Mail; Filed by Micah Sierra Williams (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • at 1:30 PM in Department 4A, Christopher K. Lui, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil; Filed by Micah Sierra Williams (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • at 1:30 PM in Department 4A, Christopher K. Lui, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel - Not Held - Rescheduled by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel; Filed by Micah Sierra Williams (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • Proof of Service by Mail; Filed by Micah Sierra Williams (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil; Filed by Micah Sierra Williams (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 4A, Christopher K. Lui, Presiding; Status Conference (Re Status of Criminal Case against defendants Knight and Williams) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 4A, Christopher K. Lui, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (as to why stay of entire case should not be lifted) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
72 More Docket Entries
  • 09/16/2015
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2015
  • ORDER RE: MOTION OF DEFENDANT, MARION KNIGHT, TO STAY ACTION PENDING OUTCOME OF CRIMINAL CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2015
  • Order; Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2015
  • NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS PENDING OUTCOME OF CRIMINAL CASE; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF LOYST P. FLETCHER; [PROPOSED] ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2015
  • Motion; Filed by Marion Hugh Jr. Knight (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2015
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Leslie Redden (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2015
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2015
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2015
  • Complaint; Filed by Leslie Redden (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2015
  • COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. ASSAULT; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC584258    Hearing Date: January 06, 2020    Dept: 4A

Motion to be Relieved as Counsel

Having considered the moving papers, the Court rules as follows.  No opposing papers were filed.

BACKGROUND

On June 4, 2015, Plaintiff Leslie Redden (“Plaintiff”) filed a complaint against Defendants Marion Hugh Knight, Jr. and Micah Sierra Williams (“Defendants”) alleging assault, battery, negligence, intentional infliction of emotional distress, conversion, and defamation.  The complaint arises from an altercation that occurred on September 4, 2014.

On October 16, 2019, Loyst P. Fletcher and the Law Offices of Loyst P. Fletcher filed a motion to be relieved as counsel for Defendant Marion Hugh Knight, Jr. pursuant to California Rules of Court, rule 3.1362.

On November 15, 2019, the Court continued the hearing on the motion to be relieved as counsel to January 6, 2020 for Loyst P. Fletcher and the Law Offices of Loyst P. Fletcher to file and serve completed MC-051, MC-052, and MC-053 forms.

Trial is set for January 15, 2020.

PARTYS REQUEST

Loyst P. Fletcher and the Law Offices of Loyst P. Fletcher, counsel for Defendant Marion Hugh Knight, Jr., seek to be relieved as counsel due to a deterioration in the relationship between Defendant Marion Hugh Knight, Jr.’s representative and counsel.

LEGAL STANDARD

California Rules of Court, rule 3.1362 (Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel) requires (1) notice of motion and motion to be directed to the client (made on the Notice of Motion and Motion to be Relieved as Counsel—Civil form (MC-051)); (2) a declaration stating in general terms and without compromising the confidentiality of the attorney-client relationship why a motion under Code of Civil Procedure section 284(2) is brought instead of filing a consent under Code of Civil Procedure section 284(1) (made on the Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel—Civil form (MC-052)); (3) service of the notice of motion and motion and declaration on all other parties who have appeared in the case; and (4) the proposed order relieving counsel (prepared on the Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel—Civil form (MC-053)).

The court has discretion to allow an attorney to withdraw, and such a motion should be granted provided that¿there is no prejudice to the client and it does not disrupt the orderly process of justice.  (See Ramirez v. Sturdevant (1994) 21 Cal.App.4th 904, 915.)

DISCUSSION

Loyst P. Fletcher and the Law Offices of Loyst P. Fletcher have filed completed MC-051, MC-052, and MC-053 forms on November 22, 2019.  These documents were served on Plaintiff and Defendants on November 22, 2019 by U.S. mail.  Loyst P. Fletcher and the Law Offices of Loyst P. Fletcher declare they have represented Defendant Marion Hugh Knight, Jr. through his business advisor, Thaddeus J. Culpepper.  Loyst P. Fletcher and the Law Offices of Loyst P. Fletcher also declare that the relationship between them and Mr. Culpepper has deteriorated to a point where it would negatively impact effective representation.

The Court finds there is good cause to grant the motion.  However, trial is less than two weeks away.  As such, granting the motion would prejudice Defendant Marion Hugh Knight, Jr. Defendant Marion Hugh Knight, Jr. to retain substitute counsel and for that counsel to prepare for trial.

The motion is DENIED.

Loyst P. Fletcher and the Law Offices of Loyst P. Fletcher are ordered to give notice of this ruling.

Case Number: BC584258    Hearing Date: November 15, 2019    Dept: 4A

Motion to be Relieved as Counsel

Having considered the moving papers, the Court rules as follows.  No opposing papers were filed.

BACKGROUND

On June 4, 2015, Plaintiff Leslie Redden (“Plaintiff”) filed a complaint against Defendants Marion Hugh Knight, Jr. and Micah Sierra Williams (“Defendants”) alleging assault, battery, negligence, intentional infliction of emotional distress, conversion, and defamation. The complaint arises from an altercation that occurred on September 4, 2014.

On October 16, 2019, Loyst P. Fletcher and the Law Offices of Loyst P. Fletcher filed a motion to be relieved as counsel for Defendant Marion Hugh Knight, Jr. pursuant to California Rules of Court, rule 3.1362.

The case is set for trial on January 15, 2020. 

PARTYS REQUEST

Loyst P. Fletcher and the Law Offices of Loyst P. Fletcher, counsel for Defendant Marion Hugh Knight, Jr., seek to be relieved as counsel due to a deterioration in the relationship between Defendant Marion Hugh Knight, Jr.’s representative and counsel.

LEGAL STANDARD

California Rules of Court, rule 3.1362 (Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel) requires (1) notice of motion and motion to be directed to the client (made on the Notice of Motion and Motion to be Relieved as Counsel—Civil form (MC-051)); (2) a declaration stating in general terms and without compromising the confidentiality of the attorney-client relationship why a motion under Code of Civil Procedure section 284(2) is brought instead of filing a consent under Code of Civil Procedure section 284(1) (made on the Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel—Civil form (MC-052)); (3) service of the notice of motion and motion and declaration on all other parties who have appeared in the case; and (4) the proposed order relieving counsel (prepared on the Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel—Civil form (MC-053)).

The court has discretion to allow an attorney to withdraw, and such a motion should be granted provided that¿there is no prejudice to the client and it does not disrupt the orderly process of justice.  (See Ramirez v. Sturdevant (1994) 21 Cal.App.4th 904, 915.)

DISCUSSION

Loyst P. Fletcher and the Law Offices of Loyst P. Fletcher have failed to use the necessary MC-051, MC-052, and MC-053 forms. 

The motion is CONTINUED to January 6, 2020 at 1:30 p.m. in Department 4A located at Spring Street Courthouse, 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, California 90012.  The Court will also entertain a motion at that time to continue the final status conference and trial date during that hearing.

Loyst P. Fletcher and the Law Offices of Loyst P. Fletcher are ordered to file and serve completed MC-051, MC-052, and MC-053 forms by 11:59 p.m. on November 22, 2019.

Loyst P. Fletcher and the Law Offices of Loyst P. Fletcher are ordered to give notice of this ruling.