This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/12/2019 at 00:18:45 (UTC).

LESLEY DUNLAP ET AL VS KEVIN KNIERIEM ET AL

Case Summary

On 02/18/2016 LESLEY DUNLAP filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against KEVIN KNIERIEM. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL JOHNSON. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0915

  • Filing Date:

    02/18/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MICHAEL JOHNSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs, Petitioners, Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

DUNLAP LESLEY

ETTEKAL AMIR

KNIERIEM KEVIN

KNIEREM DANIKA

PERAZZOLO INC. DBA ELITE CONTRACTINGMOE

CAM DEVELOPMENT CORP. MOE 2

Respondents, Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

DOES 1 THROUGH 20

KNIERIEM KEVIN

KNIEREM DANIKA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff, Petitioner and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

MARCUS WATANABE & ENOWITZ LLP

WIDENER VANESSA H. ESQ.

MASS CHRISTOPHER L.

ORLAND JAMES J. ESQ.

PEROS MICHAEL V. ESQ.

BOOTH AARON BERNARD

Defendant Attorneys

BOOTH AARON B.

VEIGUELA PETER J. ESQ.

GRANT GENOVESE & BARRATA LLP

 

Court Documents

CROSS-DEFENDANTS LESLEY DUNLAP AND AMIR ETTEKAL' REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO STRIKE PUNITIVE DAMAGES; DECLARATION OF VANESSA H. WIDENER

12/27/2017: CROSS-DEFENDANTS LESLEY DUNLAP AND AMIR ETTEKAL' REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO STRIKE PUNITIVE DAMAGES; DECLARATION OF VANESSA H. WIDENER

NOTICE OF RULING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION; NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL AND FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

2/16/2018: NOTICE OF RULING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION; NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL AND FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT; ETC.

4/16/2018: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT; ETC.

SUPPORTING BRIEF OF DEFENDANTS AND CROSS-COMPLAINANTS KEVIN AND DANIKA KNIERIEM TO MOTION FOR GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT OF CAM DEVELOPMENT; DECLARATION OF AARON B. BOOTH

5/2/2018: SUPPORTING BRIEF OF DEFENDANTS AND CROSS-COMPLAINANTS KEVIN AND DANIKA KNIERIEM TO MOTION FOR GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT OF CAM DEVELOPMENT; DECLARATION OF AARON B. BOOTH

OMNIBUS DECLARATION OF AARON B. BOOTH IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE CROSS-COMPLAINT

7/18/2018: OMNIBUS DECLARATION OF AARON B. BOOTH IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE CROSS-COMPLAINT

Minute Order

8/13/2018: Minute Order

DEFENDANTS KEVIN AND DANIKA KNIERIEM'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS' C ROSS-COMPLAINT

8/22/2018: DEFENDANTS KEVIN AND DANIKA KNIERIEM'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS' C ROSS-COMPLAINT

Minute Order

11/21/2018: Minute Order

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

3/22/2016: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

4/29/2016: NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

Minute Order

7/19/2016: Minute Order

ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE

1/6/2017: ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE

DECLARATION OF DEBRA IVERSON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR OST TO HEAR MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND/OR MOTION TO BIFURCATE AND/OR MOTION TO DISMISS

5/4/2017: DECLARATION OF DEBRA IVERSON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR OST TO HEAR MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND/OR MOTION TO BIFURCATE AND/OR MOTION TO DISMISS

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

5/23/2017: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

NOTICE OF RULING AT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE/TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

11/2/2017: NOTICE OF RULING AT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE/TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

CAM DEVELOPMENT CORP.'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO SEVER, OR ALTERNATIVELY, BIFURCATE CROSS-COMPLAINT OF CAM DEVELOPMENT CORP.

11/14/2017: CAM DEVELOPMENT CORP.'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO SEVER, OR ALTERNATIVELY, BIFURCATE CROSS-COMPLAINT OF CAM DEVELOPMENT CORP.

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF HEARING ON CROSS-DEFENDANT LESLEY DUNLAP AND AMIR ETTEKAL'S DEMURRER TO CAM DEVELOPMENT CORP.'S CROSS-COMPLAINT

12/11/2017: NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF HEARING ON CROSS-DEFENDANT LESLEY DUNLAP AND AMIR ETTEKAL'S DEMURRER TO CAM DEVELOPMENT CORP.'S CROSS-COMPLAINT

KNIERIEMS' RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS' EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO DECLARATIONS OF AARON B. BOOTH; ERIC C. WICKSTROM AND DALE R. WINCHELL IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION

12/13/2017: KNIERIEMS' RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS' EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO DECLARATIONS OF AARON B. BOOTH; ERIC C. WICKSTROM AND DALE R. WINCHELL IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION

253 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/22/2019
  • Notice (of Entry of Order re Stipulation for Dismissal with Prejudice); Filed by Lesley Dunlap (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • Notice of Ruling; Filed by Lesley Dunlap (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 73; Nunc Pro Tunc Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of 03/13/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 73; Order to Show Cause Re: (entry of proposed order, judgment and/or request for dismissal) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 73; Status Conference (Re Status of Filing Motion for Leave to Amend) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • Stipulation and Order (STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE); Filed by Lesley Dunlap (Plaintiff); Amir Ettekal (Plaintiff); Kevin Knieriem (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: entry of proposed order, judgment and...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • Notice (of Entry of Order); Filed by Kevin Knieriem (Defendant); Danika Knierem (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
563 More Docket Entries
  • 04/26/2016
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2016
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2016
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2016
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Lesley Dunlap (Plaintiff); Amir Ettekal (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2016
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2016
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2016
  • Summons; Filed by Lesley Dunlap (Plaintiff); Amir Ettekal (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2016
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by Lesley Dunlap (Plaintiff); Amir Ettekal (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2016
  • COMPLAINT: 1) TO ABATE A NUISANCE AND FOR DAMAGES; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PERAZZOLO INC is a litigant

Latest cases where CAM DEVELOPMENT INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PEROS MICHAEL VINCENT

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BOOTH AARON B.