This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/29/2019 at 00:17:40 (UTC).

LESINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY VS. EMILY TRANS, INC. ET AL

Case Summary

On 10/24/2016 LESINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against EMILY TRANS, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7353

  • Filing Date:

    10/24/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY AS SUBROGEE

Defendants

ALAVERDYAN EDGAR

EMILY TRANS INC.

ALDERMAN & HILGERS LLP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SUSTCREN ADAM VAN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/19/2017
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department F47; Ex-Parte Proceedings - Held - Motion Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • DocketEx-Parte Application; Filed by EMILY TRANS, INC. (Defendant); EDGAR ALAVERDYAN (Defendant); ALDERMAN & HILGERS, LLP (Legacy Party)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • DocketOrder After Hearing Filed; Filed by EMILY TRANS, INC. (Defendant); EDGAR ALAVERDYAN (Defendant); ALDERMAN & HILGERS, LLP (Legacy Party)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY, as subrogee (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2017
  • DocketDefault Judgment; Filed by LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY, as subrogee (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department F47; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Held, Not Settled - Conference Set) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2017
  • Docketat 00:00 AM in Department Legacy; (Request for; ENTERED) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2017
  • DocketDeclaration; Filed by LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY, as subrogee (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2017
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY, as subrogee (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2017
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY, as subrogee (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2017
  • Docketat 00:00 AM in Department Legacy; (Request to Enter Default; ENTERED) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2017
  • DocketDefault Entered; Filed by LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY, as subrogee (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2016
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY, as subrogee (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2016
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY, as subrogee (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2016
  • DocketSummons; Filed by null

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2016
  • DocketComplaint filed-Summons Issued; Filed by null

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less