This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/07/2019 at 14:17:06 (UTC).

LESA WINOKUR VS NVSI INC., ET AL.,

Case Summary

On 06/13/2016 LESA WINOKUR filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against NVSI INC , ,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MITCHELL L. BECKLOFF. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5978

  • Filing Date:

    06/13/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MITCHELL L. BECKLOFF

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WINOKUR LESA

Defendants

1ST POINT LENDING INC.

MANDILE JUSTIN

NVSI INC.

NELSON ALEX

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RODE LAUREN

Defendant Attorney

GREENBLATT LINDE & ASSOCIATES

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/03/2016
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department M; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2016
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Lesa Winokur (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2016
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Dismissal (W/OUT PREJUDICE AS TO THE ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2016
  • DocketNotice of Stay of Proceedings (Bankruptcy); Filed by NVSI Inc. (Defendant); 1st Point Lending, Inc. (Defendant); Alex Nelson (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2016
  • DocketNotice of Stay (AS RESULT OF BANKRUPTCY FILING BY PLTF. ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2016
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by NVSI Inc. (Defendant); 1st Point Lending, Inc. (Defendant); Alex Nelson (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2016
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2016
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department M; Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Motion-Appl-Preliminary Injunction; Motion Denied) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2016
  • Docketat 08:30 am in Department WEM, Mitchell L. Beckloff, Presiding; Motion-Appl-Preliminary Injunction - Motion Denied

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2016
  • DocketProof of Service (OF SUMMONS ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 06/21/2016
  • DocketDeclaration; Filed by NVSI Inc. (Defendant); 1st Point Lending, Inc. (Defendant); Alex Nelson (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2016
  • DocketEx-Parte Application; Filed by Lesa Winokur (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2016
  • DocketSummons Filed; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2016
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Lesa Winokur (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2016
  • DocketComplaint Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2016
  • DocketRequest-Waive Court Fees; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2016
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2016
  • DocketOrder-Court Fee Waiver (As to Lesa Winokur ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2016
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2016
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less