This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/05/2016 at 16:25:48 (UTC).

LEONIS WORD VS. DOUBLE ROCK BAPTIST CHURCH, ET. AL

Case Summary

On 09/17/2013 LEONIS WORD filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against DOUBLE ROCK BAPTIST CHURCH. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Compton Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are JOHN SHEPARD WILEY JR and WILLIAM BARRY. The case status is Other - Consolidated.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7616

  • Filing Date:

    09/17/2013

  • Case Status:

    Other - Consolidated

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Compton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

JOHN SHEPARD WILEY JR

WILLIAM BARRY

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

WORD LEONIS

WORD LEONIS INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF

Defendants and Respondents

BURR DEIDRA

BURRIES CURTIS

DENDY SAUNDRA K.

DOES 1-100

DOUBLE ROCK BAPTIST CHURCH

DOUBLE ROCK BAPTIST CHURCH OF COMPTON

DOUBLE ROCK COMMUNITY SERVICE CENTER INC

DOUBLE ROCK COMMUNITY SERVICE CENTER INC.

EMERY ANTOINETTE

MATTHEWS NORMA

PHILLIPS TARA

REED VIRGINIA

RENEWED LIFE CHURCH

RENEWED LIFE COMMUNITY CHURCH OF CORONA

SIMS EDDIE MAE

SIMS EUGENE JOSHUA

SUTTS ISAAC

TYLER HAROLD

14 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

LAW OFFICES OF BARBARA A. JACKSON P.C.

JACKSON BARBARA A. LAW OFFICES OF

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/21/2014
  • Summons Issued Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2014
  • Summons Filed Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2014
  • Answer to Cross-Complaint (TRUE NAME: EDDIE MAE SIMS, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS A MEMBER OF INDIVIDUALLY AND AS A MEMBBER OF THE BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF DOUBLE ROCK BAPIS CHURCH OF COMPTON ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2013
  • Order-Court Fee Waiver Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2013
  • Order-Court Fee Waiver Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2013
  • Cert Mailing-Ntc Entry Order/Doc Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2013
  • Request-Waive Court Fees Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2013
  • Request-Waive Court Fees Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2013
  • Notice-Related Cases Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2013
  • Complaint Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2013
  • Notice-Related Cases Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2013
  • Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.