Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/18/2016 at 14:12:05 (UTC).

LEONEL GUTIERREZ VS THE LAW OFFICES OF JOHN A. MENDOZA, ETAL

Case Summary

On 08/17/2012 LEONEL GUTIERREZ filed a Contract - Professional Negligence lawsuit against THE LAW OFFICES OF JOHN A MENDOZA, ETAL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are ROSS KLEIN, MICHAEL P. VICENCIA and JOSEPH E. DILORETO. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8032

  • Filing Date:

    08/17/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Professional Negligence

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

ROSS KLEIN

MICHAEL P. VICENCIA

JOSEPH E. DILORETO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LEONEL GUTIERREZ

Defendants

ADVANCE CARE SPECIALIST MED. CLINIC INC.

ERIC SCHWARTZ AN INDIVIDUAL

JENNIFER BARBER

JEREMY HOUSE AN INDIVIDUAL

JERRY CHANG AN INDIVIDUAL

JOAN LUI AN INDIVIDUAL

JOHN MENDOZA AN INDIVIDUAL

JONATHAN BRIAN AN INDIVIUDAL

NICOLAS HADENS AN INDIVIDUAL

PERONA LANGER BECK & SERBIN

THE LAW OFFICES OF JOHN A. MENDOZA

PERONA LANGER BECK SERBIN AND MENDOZA

JENNIFER BARBER-DUSS AN INDIVIDUAL

DOES 1 THROUGH 200 INCLUSIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF THOMAS HOEGH

Defendant Attorneys

HINSHAW & CULBERTSON (J SHELLER)

NEMECEK & COLE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/12/2013
  • Brief (DEFT- ADVANCE CARE SPECIALIST MEDICAL CLINIC " CONFIDENTIAL " MSC STATMENT IN CONFIDENTIAL ENV. ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2013
  • Brief (PLNTF- GUTIERREZ - PLNTF'S MSC BRIEF 11-15-13 ATTY - THOAMS HOEGH) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2013
  • Brief (DEFT- l.o mendoza; perona langer beck etc. .. - ATTY'S DEFT'S CONFDIENTIAL MSC BRIEF ... ( PUT IN CONFIDENTIAL ENVELOPE )) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2013
  • Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2013
  • Notice (PLTF'S NTC OF FILING JURY FEES ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2013
  • Notice of Ruling (DEFT- L.O MENDOZA;PERONA LANGER BE CK ETC ;JOHN MENDOZA;J LUI; E SCHW ARTZ;J CHANG; J BRIAN - NTC COURT'S URLING ON THESE DEFT 'S MO TO STRIEK 2ND AMND'D ...) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2013
  • Answer to Second Amended Complaint (DEFT- L.O MENDOZA;PERONAL LANGER B ECK ETC;J MENDOZA; J LUI; E SCHWAR TZ; J CHANG; J BRIAN - ANSWER TO 2ND AMND'D COMPLAINT ATTY - NEMICK & COLE) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2013
  • Notice of Ruling (DEFT- L.O MENDOZA; PERONA LANGER B ECK ETC,SJ MENDOZA;JONA LUI;E SCHW ARTZ;J CHANG;J BRIAN - NTC OF COURT'S RULING ON THESE DEFTS' DEM TO 2ND AMND'D COMP - COURT' 9-19-13 MIN ORD ATTACHED) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2013
  • Reply to Opposition (DEFTS-THE LAW OFFICE OF J. MENDOZA ET AL. REP TO OPP TO DEMURRER 9/17/13 ATTY: NEMECEK & COLE ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2013
  • Reply to Opposition (DEFTS-THE LAW OFFICES OF JOHN A. MENDOZA, ET AL. REP TO OPP TO MTN TO STRIKE (9/17/13) ATTY: NEMECEK & COLE ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
33 More Docket Entries
  • 09/20/2012
  • Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl (PARTY SERVED: JEREMY HOUSE, AN INDIVIDUAL PERSON SERVED: PAT STABILE ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2012
  • Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl (PARTY SERVED: JONATHAN BRIAN, AN INDIVIDUAL PERSON SERVED: PAM STABILE ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2012
  • Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl (PARTY SERVED: JOAN LUI, AN INDIVIDUAL PERSON SERVED: PAM STABILE ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2012
  • Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl (PARTY SERVED: JOHN MENDOZA, AN INDIVIDUAL PERSON SERVED: PAM STABILE ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2012
  • Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl (PARTY SERVED: NICOLAS HADENS, AN INDIVIDUAL PERSON SERVED: PAM STABILE ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2012
  • Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl (PERSON SERVED: JERRY CHANG, AN INDIVIDUAL PERSON SERVED: PAM STABILE ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2012
  • Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl (PARTY SERVED: PERONA, LANGER BECK & SERBIN AKA PERONA, LANGER, SERBINAND MENDOZA, A PROFESSIONAL CORP ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2012
  • Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl (PARTY SERVED: LA OFFICES OF JOHN MENDOZA PERSON SERVED: PAM STABILE ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2012
  • Complaint Filed (SUMMONS ISSUED ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2012
  • Summons Filed Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PERONA LANGER BECK SERBIN & MENDOZA is a litigant