This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/02/2019 at 00:45:46 (UTC).

LEON SANDERS VS. JAMES D. WALKER, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/05/2016 LEON SANDERS filed an Other lawsuit against JAMES D WALKER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BRIAN S. CURREY. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8629

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

BRIAN S. CURREY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SANDERS LEON

Defendants

DOES 1-10

ALLEN JULIA (TRUSTEE OF THE ALLEN FAMILY

WHITE SANDRA K.

REGINALD SYLVESTER LOKMAN REALTY GROUP

WALKER JAMES D.

RAMIREZ TIFFANY J. (ATTORNEY)

LOKMAN REALTY GROUP

RAMIREZ TIFFANY J. ATTORNEY

NORTH AMERICAN TITLE CO. INC.

ALLEN JULIA TRUSTEE OF THE ALLEN FAMILY

Other

LOS ANGELES SUPERIOR COURT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

JULIAN BACH ESQ.

MARSHALL JOHN B.

ESQ. JULIAN BACH

WANG JACKY P.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/03/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department B; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2017
  • Notice; Filed by NORTH AMERICAN TITLE CO., INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2017
  • Notice (OF ENTRY OF ORDER ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2017
  • Judgment (JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL IN FAVOR OF DEFENDANT JULIE ALLEN, TRUSTEE OF THE ALLEN FAMILY TRUST, DATED 1-4-2002, ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS JULIA ALLEN ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2017
  • Judgment; Filed by Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2017
  • Notice of Status Conference and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2017
  • Notice of Status Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • at 3:00 PM in Department B; Court Order (Court Order; Court Makes Order) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • at 03:00 pm in Department B, Brian S. Currey, Presiding; Court Order - Court Makes Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2017
  • Notice of Ruling (ON MOTION FOR TITLE TO HOME TO RETURNED TO OWNER ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
77 More Docket Entries
  • 12/14/2016
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by LEON SANDERS (Plaintiff); SANDRA K. WHITE (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Plaintiff, & Plaintiff in Pro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2016
  • Proof-Service/Summons (PARTY SERVED: NORTH AMERICA TITLE CO., INC. ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2016
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by LEON SANDERS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2016
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2016
  • Summons; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by LEON SANDERS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2016
  • Notice-Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2016
  • Summons Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2016
  • Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less