This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/01/2019 at 20:31:36 (UTC).

LEON, PEDRO ALBERTO VS ACOSTA-CAMPO, ITALA DEL CARMEN

Case Summary

On 10/20/2016 LEON, PEDRO ALBERTO filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against ACOSTA-CAMPO, ITALA DEL CARMEN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3740

  • Filing Date:

    10/20/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Chatsworth Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

LEON PEDRO ALBERTO

Respondent

ACOSTA-CAMPO ITALA DEL CARMEN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/24/2017
  • Notice - Entry of Judgment (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Leon, Pedro - Filed and Entered on 2017-01-24 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2017
  • Judgment (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Leon, Pedro - Filed and Entered on 2017-01-24 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2017
  • Declaration - Default FL170 (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Leon, Pedro - Filed and Entered on 2017-01-24 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2016
  • Declaration - Service of Prelim & Final Dec of Disclosure (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Leon, Pedro ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2016
  • Judgment Package Received - FC2336 (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Leon, Pedro ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2016
  • Request - Enter Default FL165 (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Leon, Pedro ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2016
  • Milestone 2 Completed (Entered Date: 01-12-17 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2016
  • Proof of Service of Summons (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Leon, Pedro ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2016
  • Milestone 1 Completed (Entered Date: 12-01-16 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • Summons (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Leon, Pedro ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • Notice (of Case Assignment to DEPT F46 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • Fee Waiver - Request - Waive Court Fees - Filed FW001 (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Leon, Pedro ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Leon, Pedro - Granted on 2016-10-20 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • Petition (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Leon, Pedro ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.