This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/29/2019 at 00:42:35 (UTC).

LEE R. FELDMAN, ET AL., VS ULIMATE WATER CREATIONS, INC. ET

Case Summary

On 06/02/2015 LEE R FELDMAN, filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ULIMATE WATER CREATIONS, INC ET. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is CRAIG D. KARLAN. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4261

  • Filing Date:

    06/02/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Santa Monica Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CRAIG D. KARLAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BROWNE REGINA M.

FELDMAN LEE R.

Defendants

CRISTESCU BARBU DAN

GOLDSTONE DONALD MARK

HANSEN MICHAEL ANGELO

HERMAN GOODMAN & ASSOCIATES INC.

ULTIMATE WATER CREATION INC.

HANSEN POOLS

HANSEN MIKE

GOLDSTONE DON

HANSEN WAATERSCAPES INC.

POOLS HANSEN

Cross Defendant

GUNITE PRECISION

Others

KAIMAN BARRY G.

TYSON & MENDES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

LORENZINI ERIC J.

KABATECK BRIAN S.

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

JEFFERY & GROSFELD

LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH LLP

WOLFE & WYMAN

SKANE WILCOX

TYSON & MENDES

WILCOX SKANE

LETOFSKY & MCCLAIN

BERMAN BERMAN BERMAN SCHNEIDER & LOWRY

KAIMAN BARRY G.

RAMIREZ DAVID P.

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

8/10/2018: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

8/8/2018: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/10/2018
  • Request for Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • Request for Entry of Dismissal (WITH PREJUDICE, ENTIRE ACTION ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Lee R. Feldman (Plaintiff); Regina M. Browne (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • Notice; Filed by Michael Angelo Hansen (Defendant); Mike Hansen (Legacy Party); Hansen Pools (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • Notice; Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • at 09:30 AM in Department N; Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Vacated) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2018
  • Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice) (X-COMPLAINT FILED BY MICHAEL ANGELO HANSEN dba POOLS 8-2-15 ); Filed by Atty for Defendant and Cross-Compl

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2018
  • Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice); Filed by Michael Angelo Hansen (Defendant); Hansen Pools (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department N; Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Vacated) -

    Read MoreRead Less
192 More Docket Entries
  • 07/07/2015
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Lee R. Feldman (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2015
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Lee R. Feldman (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2015
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Lee R. Feldman (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2015
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2015
  • Amendment to Complaint (DOE ELEVEN HANSEN WATERSCAPES, INC. ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2015
  • Amendment to Complaint; Filed by Lee R. Feldman (Plaintiff); Regina M. Browne (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2015
  • Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2015
  • Summons Filed; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2015
  • Summons; Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2015
  • Complaint; Filed by Lee R. Feldman (Plaintiff); Regina M. Browne (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.