This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/19/2019 at 20:58:12 (UTC).

LEE PALER VS INTEGRITY INGREDIENTS CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 10/13/2015 LEE PALER filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against INTEGRITY INGREDIENTS CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RAMONA G. SEE. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0893

  • Filing Date:

    10/13/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Torrance Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

RAMONA G. SEE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LEE PALER

Defendants

DOES 1-100

INTEGRITY INGREDIENTS CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

VARNER & BRANDT LLP

MORAND ANDREW RICHARD

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

10/13/2015: Notice of Case Management Conference

Minute Order

10/20/2015: Minute Order

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

10/27/2015: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

1/27/2016: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Unknown

1/27/2016: Unknown

Unknown

2/1/2016: Unknown

Unknown

2/23/2016: Unknown

Unknown

4/1/2016: Unknown

Unknown

10/18/2016: Unknown

Other -

12/13/2016: Other -

Unknown

12/27/2017: Unknown

Unknown

12/27/2017: Unknown

FINAL RETURN TO COURT WRIT OF EXECUTION

8/7/2018: FINAL RETURN TO COURT WRIT OF EXECUTION

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

10/3/2018: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

Other -

10/3/2018: Other -

Minute Order

10/3/2018: Minute Order

Notice

10/26/2018: Notice

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

12/14/2018: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/16/2019
  • at 08:33 AM in Department M; Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • Notice of Ruling; Filed by Paler Lee (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment; Filed by Paler Lee (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • Minute Order ((Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • Notice of Ruling; Filed by Paler Lee (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • at 08:33 AM in Department M; Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore; Filed by Paler Lee (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • Minute Order ((Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • Notice (of Continuance of Judgment Debtor Examination and Notice to Appear and Produce Documents); Filed by Paler Lee (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • at 08:33 AM in Department M; Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
31 More Docket Entries
  • 01/27/2016
  • Declaration; Filed by Paler Lee (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2015
  • Default Entered; Filed by Paler Lee (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2015
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Paler Lee (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2015
  • OSC-RE Other (Miscellaneous); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2015
  • Minute Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2015
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2015
  • Summons; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2015
  • Demand for Jury Trial; Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2015
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2015
  • Complaint; Filed by Paler Lee (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.