Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/24/2016 at 14:34:53 (UTC).

LEAN ARCH, INC. VS MAHER AZER

Case Summary

On 10/20/2008 LEAN ARCH, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against MAHER AZER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MARK S. ARNOLD, CARY NISHIMOTO, MICHAEL P. VICENCIA, WILLIAM G. WILLETT and DUDLEY W. GRAY II. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8348

  • Filing Date:

    10/20/2008

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Torrance Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MARK S. ARNOLD

CARY NISHIMOTO

MICHAEL P. VICENCIA

WILLIAM G. WILLETT

DUDLEY W. GRAY II

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant

LEAN ARCH INC.

Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

J.D. BURGESS CONSTRUCTION

JAMES NOLIND PLASTERING INC. ROE 15

Cross Defendants

BUILDING INDUSTRIES SOLOR INC. ROE 1

JAMES NOLIND PLASTERING INC. ROE 15

ROES 1-50 INCLUSIVE

ONE STOP DOOR SHOP INC. ROE 16

COASTLINE STEEL CORP. ROE 2

LEAN ARCH INC.

SAM THE TILE MAN ROE 18

LUMEN-8 INC. ROE 13

LOPEZ ELECTRIC INC. ROE 10

COASTLINE STEEL ROE 3

MARIO'S PAINTING ROE 32

LUCIEN PLUMBING ROE 29

ONE STOP WINDOWS & DOORS (DBA) ROE 16

CALIFORNIA SOLAR (DBA) ROE 1

BARON DAVID

PACIFIC HARDWOOD CO. INC.

RBH INSULATION INC. ROE 31

PERSICO HARDWOOD IMPORTS INC. ROE 17

STEEL TOE ENTERPRISES DBA ANDERSON WELDIN

29 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Cross Defendant and Plaintiff Attorneys

RAMEY JOHN F.

ALSTON & BIRD LLP

ROUX G. CHRISTIAN

JENNINGS MARC

GREEN TODD A.

CANNON CATHERINE M.

WEINBERG MARC

STEWART JEFFREY N.

BROWN BONN & FRIEDMAN LLP

SCOUTON ROGER O.

TAMARA AL. LASKIN

WILCOX WENDY L.

WAIT & COLFER

CIPITI NICHOLAS A.

SKAPIK LAW GROUP

Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

FELDMAN IAN R.

RUIZ CHRISTOPHER P. APLC

Other Attorneys

STONE ROSENBLATT & CHA

CHAPMAN GLUCKSMAN & DEAN

KAPLAN JEFFREY S.

11 More Attorneys Available

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/03/2011
  • Notice ( OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2011
  • Partial Dismissal(not entire case) ( CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY CHARLES JOHNSON ROOFING, INC. ON 6/22/10 WITH PREJUDICE ) Filed by Attorney for X-Deft/X-Comp

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2011
  • Ntc Of Entry of Dismissal & P.O.S. Filed by Attorney for X-Deft/X-Comp

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2011
  • Notice of Entry of Dismissal & P&S Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2011
  • Partial Dismissal(not entire case) ( CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY MAHER AZER, M.D. ON 9/15/09 WITH PREJUDICE ) Filed by Atty for Defendant and Cross-Compl

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2011
  • Partial Dismissal(not entire case) ( CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY J.D. BURGESS CONSTRUCTION ON 4/1/10 EACH PARTY TO BEAR THEIR OWN FEES AND COSTS WITH PREJUDICE ) Filed by Atty for Defendant and Cross-Compl

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2011
  • Partial Dismissal(not entire case) ( CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY JAMES NOLIND PLASTERING, INC. ON 3/18/10 WITH PREJUDICE ) Filed by Atty for Defendant and Cross-Compl

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2011
  • Notice of Ruling ( RE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE COMPLIANCE WITH SETTLEMENT TERMS, ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE FAILURE TO DISTRIBUTE SETTLEMENT FUNDS PURSUANT TO SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2011
  • Partial Dismissal(not entire case) ( CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY J.D. BURGESS CONSTRUCTION ON 4/1/10 AS TO SANTA MONICA WHOLESALE LIGHTING & ELECTRICAL SUPPLY EACH PARTY TO BEAR ITS OWN FEES AND COSTS. WITHOUT PREJUDICE) Filed by Attorney for Cross-Complainant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2011
  • Declaration ( OF NIV N. DAVIDOVICH RE: OSC RE: FAILURE TO DISTRIBUTE SETTLEMENT FUNDS ) Filed by Attorney for Cross-Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
250 More Docket Entries
  • 02/20/2009
  • Opposition (TO DEFT'S DEMURRER ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2009
  • Opposition (TO DEFT'S MTN TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLTFF'S COMPLAINT ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2009
  • Notice of Motion (MTN TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLTFF'S COMPLAINT ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2009
  • Demurrer Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2008
  • Proof of Service (SUMMONS & COMPLAINT PARTY SERVED: MAHER AZER BY SERVING: PERSONAL DELIVERY ON 10/27/08 AT 1:20 PM ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2008
  • Notice (OF PENDENCY OF ACTION ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2008
  • OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2008
  • Summons Filed Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2008
  • Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2008
  • Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ONE STOP DOOR SHOP INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where LEAN ARCH INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where ONE STOP WINDOWS & DOORS is a litigant

Latest cases where RBH INSULATION INC. is a litigant