This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/23/2019 at 10:28:30 (UTC).

LAZARA HERNANDEZ VS KORDA GROUP INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 09/30/2015 LAZARA HERNANDEZ filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against KORDA GROUP INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Burbank Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BENNY C. OSORIO. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6359

  • Filing Date:

    09/30/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Burbank Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

BENNY C. OSORIO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

HERNANDEZ LAZARA

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1-10

KORDA GROUP INC

W-FOUNTAINS DIAMOND-BAR LP

RPK DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION AKA KORDA

SOUTH COAST PIERING INC. DBA SABER

Other

WILLIAMS GARRY W. ESQ.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

LAW OFFICES OF WILLIAM D. KOEHLER

KOEHLER WILLIAM D. (LAW OFFICES OF)

KOEHLER WILLIAM D. LAW OFFICES OF

WILLIAMS GARRY W. ESQ.

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

DAVIDIAN LINA S. ESQ.

REINHOLTZ JACK R. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

10/9/2015: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

1ST AMENDED SUMMONS

10/9/2015: 1ST AMENDED SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

11/20/2015: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRIOR PLEADINGS AND DISCOVERY

9/26/2016: PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRIOR PLEADINGS AND DISCOVERY

SEPARATE STATEMENT ACCOMPANYING MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES (SET ONE) PROPOUNDED TO BEFENDANT W-FOUNTAINS DIAMOND-BAR L.P.

10/26/2016: SEPARATE STATEMENT ACCOMPANYING MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES (SET ONE) PROPOUNDED TO BEFENDANT W-FOUNTAINS DIAMOND-BAR L.P.

NOTICE OF MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES OF DEFENDANT W-FOUNTAINS DIAMOND-BAR L.P. SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES ETC.

10/26/2016: NOTICE OF MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES OF DEFENDANT W-FOUNTAINS DIAMOND-BAR L.P. SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES ETC.

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE AND MOTIONS TO COMPEL FURTHER DISCOVERY RESPONSES BEING TAKEN OFF CALENDAR

12/9/2016: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE AND MOTIONS TO COMPEL FURTHER DISCOVERY RESPONSES BEING TAKEN OFF CALENDAR

INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE FORM FOR PERSONAL INJURY COURTS (DEPARTMENT 91,92, 93, 97)

12/9/2016: INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE FORM FOR PERSONAL INJURY COURTS (DEPARTMENT 91,92, 93, 97)

PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRIOR PLEADINGS AND DISCOVERY

1/23/2017: PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRIOR PLEADINGS AND DISCOVERY

Minute Order

2/1/2017: Minute Order

DEFENDANTS' SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

4/27/2017: DEFENDANTS' SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

6/6/2017: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

DEMAND FOR EXCHANGE OF EXPERT TRIAL WETNESS INFORMATION

6/14/2017: DEMAND FOR EXCHANGE OF EXPERT TRIAL WETNESS INFORMATION

DEFENDANTS' REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF ITS OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

7/14/2017: DEFENDANTS' REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF ITS OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE

7/19/2017: ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE

Minute Order

8/18/2017: Minute Order

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

11/1/2017: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

11/15/2017: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

43 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/01/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 97; (OSC RE Dismissal; Order of Dismissal) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 97; Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Case Deemed Settled) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2018
  • Minute order entered: 2018-01-17 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2018
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 97; Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Case Deemed Settled) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2018
  • Minute order entered: 2018-01-04 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2017
  • Request and Entry of Dismissal; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2017
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2017
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • Partial Dismissal (with Prejudice); Filed by Cross-Complainant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • Partial Dismissal (with Prejudice) (as to cross complaint filed by south coast piering, inc. only ); Filed by Attorney for Cross-Complainant

    Read MoreRead Less
167 More Docket Entries
  • 10/09/2015
  • COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2015
  • Summons; Filed by Lazara Hernandez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2015
  • Summons Filed (ON FAC ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2015
  • First Amended Complaint; Filed by Lazara Hernandez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2015
  • 1ST AMENDED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2015
  • First Amended Complaint; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2015
  • COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2015
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2015
  • Complaint; Filed by Lazara Hernandez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2015
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KORDA GROUP is a litigant

Latest cases where SOUTH COAST PIERING INC. DBA SABER FOUNDATIONS is a litigant

Latest cases where R.P.K. DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DAVIDIAN LINA S. ESQ.