This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/11/2021 at 20:15:01 (UTC).

LAWRENCE ROSE VS KIRK RETZ

Case Summary

On 10/04/2012 LAWRENCE ROSE filed a Contract - Professional Negligence lawsuit against KIRK RETZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ELIZABETH ALLEN WHITE. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3252

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2012

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Professional Negligence

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ELIZABETH ALLEN WHITE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs, Petitioners and Cross Defendants

ROSE LAWRENCE

LAW OFFICES OF KIRK J. RETZ APC

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 THROUGH 5

RETZ KIRK

Cross Plaintiff and Cross Defendant

LAW OFFICES OF KIRK J. RETZ APC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

BRIFMAN LAW CORPORATION

CARYL JESSE M. ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

LUNDY ALBRO L. III ESQ.

Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

LUNDY ALBRO L. III

RETZ KIRK J.

 

Court Documents

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY -

4/23/2018: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY -

Other - - PETITION TO CORRECT CONTRACTUAL ARBITRATION AWARD AND NOTICE OF HEARING THEREON

12/17/2018: Other - - PETITION TO CORRECT CONTRACTUAL ARBITRATION AWARD AND NOTICE OF HEARING THEREON

Notice of Ruling

3/1/2019: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

3/19/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Substitution of Attorney

5/16/2019: Substitution of Attorney

Motion re: - MOTION RE: PETITION TO CONFIRM CONTRACTUAL ARBITRATION AWARD

7/12/2019: Motion re: - MOTION RE: PETITION TO CONFIRM CONTRACTUAL ARBITRATION AWARD

Request for Judicial Notice

11/6/2019: Request for Judicial Notice

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

10/11/2012: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Minute Order -

2/20/2013: Minute Order -

Minute Order -

9/5/2013: Minute Order -

CONTRACT- CROSS-COMPLAINT

11/21/2013: CONTRACT- CROSS-COMPLAINT

Minute Order -

9/15/2014: Minute Order -

Minute Order -

7/13/2015: Minute Order -

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF DATE RE STATUS CONFERENCE

10/6/2016: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF DATE RE STATUS CONFERENCE

NOTICE OF RULING RE STATUS CONFERENCE SET 10/7/16 AND NOTICE OF OSC RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE ACTION

10/11/2016: NOTICE OF RULING RE STATUS CONFERENCE SET 10/7/16 AND NOTICE OF OSC RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE ACTION

Minute Order -

11/9/2016: Minute Order -

NOTICE OF RULING RE OSC RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE ACTION

11/16/2016: NOTICE OF RULING RE OSC RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE ACTION

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF STATUS CONFERENCE REGARDING ARBITRATION OF CROSS-COMPLAINT

2/14/2017: NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF STATUS CONFERENCE REGARDING ARBITRATION OF CROSS-COMPLAINT

60 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketAcknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment; Filed by Law Offices of Kirk J. Retz, APC (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • DocketJudgment (- Arbitration Award - Before Trial - 12/03/2019 entered for Cross-Complainant Law Offices of Kirk J. Retz, APC against Cross-Defendant Lawrence Rose.); Filed by Law Offices of Kirk J. Retz, APC (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 48, Elizabeth Allen White, Presiding; Hearing on Motion - Other (Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • DocketRuling: Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Petitioner Kirk Retz's Petition to Confirm Contrac...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • DocketReply (PETITIONER'S REPLY BRIEF); Filed by Law Offices of Kirk J. Retz, APC (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • DocketRequest for Judicial Notice; Filed by Law Offices of Kirk J. Retz, APC (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • DocketRequest for Judicial Notice (IN SUPPORT OF RESPONDENT'S OPPOSITION TO PETITIONER'S PETITION TO CONFIRM CONTRACTUAL ARBITRATION AWARD); Filed by Lawrence Rose (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • DocketOpposition (To Petitioner's Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award); Filed by Lawrence Rose (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 48, Elizabeth Allen White, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Filing of Petition to Confirm Arbitration) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
131 More Docket Entries
  • 01/11/2013
  • DocketDeclaration; Filed by Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2013
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2013
  • DocketPetition; Filed by Kirk Retz (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2013
  • DocketNOTICE OF PETITION AND PETITION OF DEFENDANT TO COMPEL ARBITRATION OF CONTROVERSY AND REQUEST FOR MONEFARY SANCTIONS PURSUANT TO C.C.P. SECTION 128.5; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF AERBO L. UJNJ)Y III I)ECLARATION OF KIRK J. RETZ; I

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2013
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Kirk Retz (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2012
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2012
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2012
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2012
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2012
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR MALPRACTICE

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC493252    Hearing Date: November 14, 2019    Dept: 48

PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD

MOVING PARTY: Petitioner/Defendant/Cross-Complainant Kirk J. Retz

RESPONDING PARTY(S): Respondent/Plaintiff/Cross-Defendant Lawrence Rose

PROOF OF SERVICE:


[1]

(b)  If the arbitration agreement does not provide the manner in which such service shall be made and the person upon whom service is to be made has not previously appeared in the proceeding and has not previously been served in accordance with this subdivision:

(1) 

(2) 

CCP § 1290.4.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer RETZ KIRK J

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LUNDY ALBRO L