Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/25/2019 at 13:46:15 (UTC).

LAWNDALE HEALTHCARE & WELLNESS CENTRE LLC ET AL VS ELYSIAN C

Case Summary

On 10/28/2015 LAWNDALE HEALTHCARE WELLNESS CENTRE LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ELYSIAN C. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is TERESA SANCHEZ-GORDON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9211

  • Filing Date:

    10/28/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

TERESA SANCHEZ-GORDON

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

LAWLAND LLC

LAWNDALE HEALTHCARE & WELLNESS CENTRE

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 TO 100

ELYSIAN CARE CORPORATION

LAWNDALE HEALTHCARE ENTERPRISES LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

ABRAMSON MICHAEL A. ESQ.

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

ANDERSON ABLON LEWIS & GALE LAW O/O

GALE JERALD ELLIS

 

Court Documents

Unknown

10/17/2018: Unknown

Status Report

12/12/2018: Status Report

Minute Order

4/11/2019: Minute Order

COMPLAINT FOR: 1) BREACH OF CONTRACT; ETC

10/28/2015: COMPLAINT FOR: 1) BREACH OF CONTRACT; ETC

Minute Order

11/4/2015: Minute Order

Minute Order

11/10/2015: Minute Order

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE AND DECLARATION OF JERALD E. GALE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS ELYSIAN CARE CORPORATION'S AND LAWNDALE HEALTHCARE ENTERPRISES, LLC'S DEMURRERS TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT [EVID. C

1/19/2016: REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE AND DECLARATION OF JERALD E. GALE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS ELYSIAN CARE CORPORATION'S AND LAWNDALE HEALTHCARE ENTERPRISES, LLC'S DEMURRERS TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT [EVID. C

Minute Order

1/21/2016: Minute Order

PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF FILING FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT [CCP SECTION 472]

7/27/2016: PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF FILING FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT [CCP SECTION 472]

SUMMONS ON FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

7/27/2016: SUMMONS ON FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

PLAINTIFFS' DECLARATION RE: MOOTNESS OF STATUS CONFERENCE ON CONSOLIDATION OF RELATED CASES

7/28/2016: PLAINTIFFS' DECLARATION RE: MOOTNESS OF STATUS CONFERENCE ON CONSOLIDATION OF RELATED CASES

DECLARATION PURSUANT TO C.C.P. SECTION 430.41 IN SUPPORT OF "MEET AND CONFER" PRIOR TO FILING OF DEMURRERS TO PLAINTIFFS' FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

8/24/2016: DECLARATION PURSUANT TO C.C.P. SECTION 430.41 IN SUPPORT OF "MEET AND CONFER" PRIOR TO FILING OF DEMURRERS TO PLAINTIFFS' FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF: 1) NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF HEARING ON DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; AND STATUS CONFERENCE CONSOLIDATION; ETC.

8/24/2016: PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF: 1) NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF HEARING ON DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; AND STATUS CONFERENCE CONSOLIDATION; ETC.

DECLARATION OF JERALD E. GALE RE: REQUEST FOR IMPOSITION OF MONETARY SANCTIONS AGAINST PLAINTIFFS AND THEIR ATTORNEYS OF RECORD PURSUANT TO C.C.P. SECTION 128.5 IN A SUM NOT LESS THAN $4,000.

8/24/2016: DECLARATION OF JERALD E. GALE RE: REQUEST FOR IMPOSITION OF MONETARY SANCTIONS AGAINST PLAINTIFFS AND THEIR ATTORNEYS OF RECORD PURSUANT TO C.C.P. SECTION 128.5 IN A SUM NOT LESS THAN $4,000.

Unknown

8/31/2016: Unknown

SUPPLEMENTAL REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF ELYSIAN CARE CORPORATION'S AND LAWNDALE HEALTHCARE ENTERPRISES, LLC'S DEMURRERS TO PLAINTIFFS' FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT, ETC

1/24/2017: SUPPLEMENTAL REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF ELYSIAN CARE CORPORATION'S AND LAWNDALE HEALTHCARE ENTERPRISES, LLC'S DEMURRERS TO PLAINTIFFS' FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT, ETC

DEFENDANTS' REPLY MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES TO PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEMURRERS TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT, AND ETC

1/24/2017: DEFENDANTS' REPLY MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES TO PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEMURRERS TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT, AND ETC

Minute Order

5/25/2017: Minute Order

37 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/12/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 74; Further Status Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Further Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 74; Further Status Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Further Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 74; Further Status Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Further Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • Notice (PLAINTIFFS' STATUS CONFERENCE REPORT (BC599211)); Filed by Lawndale Healthcare & Wellness Centre, (Plaintiff); Lawland, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • Notice (Defendants' Status Conference Report); Filed by Elysian Care Corporation (Defendant); Lawndale Healthcare Enterprises, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 74; Further Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 74; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
90 More Docket Entries
  • 11/10/2015
  • Minute order entered: 2015-11-10 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2015
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2015
  • at 00:00 AM in Department 74; Court Order - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2015
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2015
  • Minute order entered: 2015-11-04 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2015
  • NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2015
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2015
  • Notice of Related Case; Filed by Lawndale Healthcare & Wellness Centre, (Plaintiff); Lawland, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2015
  • Complaint; Filed by Lawndale Healthcare & Wellness Centre, (Plaintiff); Lawland, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2015
  • COMPLAINT FOR: 1) BREACH OF CONTRACT; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC599211    Hearing Date: July 09, 2020    Dept: 74

BC599211 LAWNDALE HEALTHCARE & WELLNESS CENTRE LLC vs ELYSIAN CENTRE

(1) Motion to Lift Stay

(2) Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint

TENTATIVE RULINGS:

(1) Plaintiffs’ motion to lift the voluntary, stipulated stay is GRANTED. If defendants wish to reinstate the stay, it may make a request via noticed motion.

(2) Plaintiffs’ motion for leave to file a SAC is GRANTED. Court take a liberal approach when a party seeks to amend a pleading; generally, the court allows leave to amend a pleading so long as it is in the interest of justice. (Code Civ. Proc., §§ 473(a)(1); Magpali v. Farmers Group, Inc. (1996) 48 Cal.App.4th 471, 487.) Defendants fail to sufficiently establish how the SAC appears to be a façade or the pleading is legally defective and cannot be cured by an amendment. The SAC shall be filed and served within 10 days. Moving party to give notice.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ELYSIAN CARE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where LAWNDALE HEALTHCARE & WELLNESS CENTER LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant