Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/14/2016 at 22:05:40 (UTC).

LAWANA CONKLIN VS. WILLIAM CONKLIN

Case Summary

On 10/28/2011 LAWANA CONKLIN filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against WILLIAM CONKLIN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is CHEMELESKI, JOHN. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7482

  • Filing Date:

    10/28/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CHEMELESKI, JOHN

 

Party Details

Petitioner

CONKLIN LAWANA

Respondent

CONKLIN WILLIAM

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/29/2016
  • Declaration-Income & Expense (by RESP )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • Dissomaster Printout (by court )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • Stipulation-Judge Pro Tem (BY PET & RESP )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2016
  • Agreement-Conciliation Crt-& Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2016
  • Miscellaneous Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2016
  • Verification of Completion Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2015
  • Declaration-Income & Expense Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2015
  • Declaration-Uniform Custody Minor' Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2015
  • Declaration Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2015
  • Proof of Service-Mail Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 10/12/2012
  • Request-Enter Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2012
  • Proof of Service-Summons & Com Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2012
  • Declaration-Serv Pre Dec Dis Inc Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2012
  • Decl For Deflt or Uncontested Jdgm Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2012
  • Notice-Status Conference-POS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2011
  • Order-Court Fee Waiver Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2011
  • Declaration-Uniform Custody Minor' Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2011
  • Petition-Dissolution Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2011
  • Request- Waive Court Fees Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2011
  • Summons-Family Law Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less