This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/30/2020 at 04:44:33 (UTC).

LAW OFFICES OF HARVEY J MILLER VS DMCF LLC ET AL

Case Summary

On 02/08/2012 LAW OFFICES OF HARVEY J MILLER filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against DMCF LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8550

  • Filing Date:

    02/08/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LAW OFFICES OF HARVEY J. MILLER

Defendants

DMCF LLC

MCCALLEN DAVID

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MILLER HARVEY J. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGEMENT -

12/9/2015: ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGEMENT -

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

6/25/2012: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

NOTICE OF STAY OF PROCEEDINGS

6/15/2012: NOTICE OF STAY OF PROCEEDINGS

REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT

5/25/2012: REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

5/25/2012: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

JUDGMENT

5/25/2012: JUDGMENT

Minute Order -

5/25/2012: Minute Order -

SUMMARY OF CASE; DECLARATION OF RONALD G. ROSENBERG IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF?S REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF COURT JUDGMENT

5/25/2012: SUMMARY OF CASE; DECLARATION OF RONALD G. ROSENBERG IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF?S REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF COURT JUDGMENT

Minute Order -

4/13/2012: Minute Order -

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

4/3/2012: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE AND ORDER

3/7/2012: NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE AND ORDER

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

3/5/2012: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

3/5/2012: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

2/21/2012: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

COMPLAINT FOR: 1. BREACH OF WRITTEN CONTRACT; ETC

2/8/2012: COMPLAINT FOR: 1. BREACH OF WRITTEN CONTRACT; ETC

SUMMONS -

2/8/2012: SUMMONS -

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/09/2015
  • DocketSatisfaction of Judgment; Filed by Law Offices of Harvey J. Miller (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2015
  • DocketACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2012
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2012
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims; Filed by Creditor

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2012
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment; Filed by Creditor

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2012
  • DocketWrit-Other Issued; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2012
  • DocketNotice; Filed by DMCF, LLC (Defendant); David McCallen (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2012
  • DocketNOTICE OF STAY OF PROCEEDINGS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2012
  • DocketWrit-Other Issued; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2012
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims; Filed by Creditor

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 03/07/2012
  • DocketNOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE AND ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2012
  • DocketNotice of Status Conference filed; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2012
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2012
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Law Offices of Harvey J. Miller (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2012
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2012
  • DocketOSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2012
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2012
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2012
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Law Offices of Harvey J. Miller (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2012
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR: 1. BREACH OF WRITTEN CONTRACT; ETC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less