This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/30/2016 at 10:56:40 (UTC).

LAURIE DEVRIES ET AL VS RENAISSANCE HOTEL MANAGEMENT LLC ET

Case Summary

On 07/25/2014 LAURIE DEVRIES filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against RENAISSANCE HOTEL MANAGEMENT LLC ET. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are ELIA WEINBACH, MICHELLE WILLIAMS COURT and STUART M. RICE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2750

  • Filing Date:

    07/25/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Torrance Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

ELIA WEINBACH

MICHELLE WILLIAMS COURT

STUART M. RICE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

DEVRIES LAURIE

DEVRIES LEE

LEE DEVRIES

LAURIE DEVRIES

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1-50

RENAISSANCE HOTEL MANAGEMENT COMPANY LLC

SUNSTONE HOTEL INVESTORS INC.

MARRIOTT INTERNATIONAL INC. (DOE 1)

MARRIOT INTERNATIONAL INC. (DOE 1)

RENAISSANCE HOTEL OPERATING COMPANY (DOE2

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF ALAIN V. BONAVIDA

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

FORD WALKER HAGGERTY & BEHAR

ROBERT L. REISINGER

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS

7/25/2014: SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

8/19/2014: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

8/19/2014: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

8/29/2014: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

Unknown

8/29/2014: Unknown

Unknown

8/29/2014: Unknown

CIVIL DEPOSIT

9/23/2014: CIVIL DEPOSIT

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL AND CONFIRMATION OF PAYMENT OF INITIAL DEPOSIT TOWARDS JURY FEES

10/29/2014: DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL AND CONFIRMATION OF PAYMENT OF INITIAL DEPOSIT TOWARDS JURY FEES

Minute Order

4/9/2015: Minute Order

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

4/28/2015: AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES AND REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS; ETC.

7/29/2015: DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES AND REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS; ETC.

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

8/10/2015: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

Minute Order

9/8/2015: Minute Order

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

9/29/2015: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

9/29/2015: DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

Minute Order

10/20/2015: Minute Order

MOTION / OPPOSITION / STIPULATION TO TRANSFER COMPLICATED PERSONAL INJURY CASE TO INDEPENDENT CALENDAR COURT AND ORDER

10/20/2015: MOTION / OPPOSITION / STIPULATION TO TRANSFER COMPLICATED PERSONAL INJURY CASE TO INDEPENDENT CALENDAR COURT AND ORDER

Unknown

11/4/2015: Unknown

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/14/2016
  • Amendment to Complaint (DOE 2 IS RENAISSANCE HOTEL OPERATING COMAPNY ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2016
  • Summons Filed ((SECOND AMENDE SUMMONS) ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2016
  • Miscellaneous-Other (JOINT SUMMARY FOR INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONF ON 3/14/16 ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2016
  • Miscellaneous-Other (JOINT SUMMARY FOR INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE ON 3/14/16 ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Notice of Ruling (AS TO MTNS TO COMPEL BOTH PLTS AT DEPO ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2016
  • Reply (TO OPP TO MTN TO COMPEL ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2016
  • Opposition (TO MTN TO COMPEL ATTENDANCE OF PTL AT DEPO IN CALIF ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2016
  • Opposition (TO MTN TO COMPEL ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2016
  • Notice (OF RESCHEDULED HEARING DATE RE;MTN TO COMPEL ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2016
  • Notice of Motion (TO COMPEL ATTENDANCE OF PLTS AT DEPO ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 08/29/2014
  • Answer to Complaint Filed Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2014
  • Demand for Jury Trial Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2014
  • Answer (Renaissance Hotel Management Company & Sunstone Hotel Investors ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2014
  • Demand for Jury Trial Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2014
  • Proof-Service/Summons (PTY SERVED: SUNSTONE HOTEL INVESTORS, INC. PERSON SERVED: JAN LAPIDES, AGENT FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2014
  • Proof-Service/Summons ((2) rENAISSANC Hotel Management Company & Sunstone Hotel Investors ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2014
  • Proof-Service/Summons (PTY SERVED: RENAISSAN HOTEL MANAGEMENT COMPANY PERSONS ERVED: RAZIUR RAHMAN, PERSON IN CHARGE ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2014
  • Summons Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2014
  • Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2014
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC552750    Hearing Date: December 12, 2019    Dept: SWB

Superior Court of California

County of Los Angeles

Southwest District

Torrance Dept. B

LAURIE DEVRIES, et al.,

Plaintiffs,

Case No.:

BC552750

vs.

[Tentative] RULING

RENAISSANCE HOTEL MANAGEMENT, et al.,

Defendants.

Hearing Date: December 12, 2019

Moving Parties: Plaintiffs Laurie Devries and Lee Devries

Responding Party: Defendants Renaissance Hotel Management Company, LLC, et al.

Motion to Tax Costs

The court considered the moving and opposition papers.

RULING

Moving party is ordered to contact the trial court in Dept. X in Alhambra to reschedule the hearing on the motion to tax costs.