This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/23/2019 at 01:28:49 (UTC).

LAURENCE JOHNSON VS RAYTHEON CO

Case Summary

On 11/04/2014 LAURENCE JOHNSON filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against RAYTHEON CO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are TERESA A. BEAUDET, SAMANTHA JESSNER, DEIRDRE HILL and BENNY C. OSORIO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2444

  • Filing Date:

    11/04/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

TERESA A. BEAUDET

SAMANTHA JESSNER

DEIRDRE HILL

BENNY C. OSORIO

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

JOHNSON LAURENCE

ABM INDUSTRIES INC.

Defendants, Respondents and Cross Plaintiffs

DOES 1 THROUGH 100

RAYTHEON COMPANY

SYSTEMS XT INC.

POWER EDGE SOLUTIONS INC. AKA PES CONTRO

CITY OF SANTA CLARITA

BROWNCO CONSTRUCTION COMPANY INC.

Defendants and Cross Defendants

SYSTEMS XT INC.

POWER EDGE SOLUTIONS INC. AKA PES CONTRO

BROWNCO CONSTRUCTION COMPANY INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

STEINBRECHER AND ASSOCIATES

PARTAIN ROBERT MERRILL

STEINBRECHER EDWARD

POSNER BLAKE S.

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

BURKE WILLIAMS & SORENSEN LLP

JOHNSON MICHAEL DAVID

MARTIN R BRYAN

MCDERMOTT PHILIP EMORY

THUYEN KANE

Cross Plaintiff Attorney

HAMBLET BRIAN INMAN

Other Attorneys

PRICE LESLIE MEAD JR

LEE KATHRYN CLAIRE

 

Court Documents

Separate Statement

8/30/2019: Separate Statement

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER RE THE FIVE-YEAR RULE

10/7/2019: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER RE THE FIVE-YEAR RULE

Stipulation - No Order - STIPULATION - NO ORDER STIPULATION RE CONTINUING HEARING ON POWER EDGE SOLUTIONS MSJ AND SPECIALLY SETTING HEARING DATE ON MOTION FOR GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT

10/24/2019: Stipulation - No Order - STIPULATION - NO ORDER STIPULATION RE CONTINUING HEARING ON POWER EDGE SOLUTIONS MSJ AND SPECIALLY SETTING HEARING DATE ON MOTION FOR GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (DEFENDANT POWER EDGE SOLUTIONS, INC.'S, AKA PES CONTROLS, EX ...)

10/28/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (DEFENDANT POWER EDGE SOLUTIONS, INC.'S, AKA PES CONTROLS, EX ...)

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF GEORGE KNOPFLER IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT POWER EDGE SOLUTIONS, INC. AKA PES CONTROLS' MOTION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT

11/1/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF GEORGE KNOPFLER IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT POWER EDGE SOLUTIONS, INC. AKA PES CONTROLS' MOTION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Notice

3/30/2017: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Notice

Minute Order - Minute order entered: 2017-06-01 00:00:00

6/1/2017: Minute Order - Minute order entered: 2017-06-01 00:00:00

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Stipulation and Order

8/10/2017: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Stipulation and Order

Notice - Notice Of Association of Counsel

2/13/2018: Notice - Notice Of Association of Counsel

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice -

8/13/2018: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice -

Declaration - Declaration Of Robert M. Partain Re: Status Of Appeal

12/4/2018: Declaration - Declaration Of Robert M. Partain Re: Status Of Appeal

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF TRANSFER OF CASE TO JUDGE SAMANTHA JESSNER

5/8/2019: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF TRANSFER OF CASE TO JUDGE SAMANTHA JESSNER

Memorandum - MEMORANDUM ON APPEAL

6/14/2019: Memorandum - MEMORANDUM ON APPEAL

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

7/25/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Complaint in Intervention - ABM INDUSTRIES, INC.'S COMPLAINT-IN-INTERVENTION FOR REIMBURSEMENT OF WORKER'S COMPENSATION BENEFITS

7/26/2019: Complaint in Intervention - ABM INDUSTRIES, INC.'S COMPLAINT-IN-INTERVENTION FOR REIMBURSEMENT OF WORKER'S COMPENSATION BENEFITS

Minute Order -

1/15/2015: Minute Order -

NOTICE OF MINUTE ORDER REGARDING NOTICE OF REMOVAL OF CIVIL ACTION TO UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT

1/23/2015: NOTICE OF MINUTE ORDER REGARDING NOTICE OF REMOVAL OF CIVIL ACTION TO UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT

DEFENDANT RAYTHEON COMPANY'S REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE

4/29/2016: DEFENDANT RAYTHEON COMPANY'S REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE

84 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2020
  • Hearing01/13/2020 at 09:00 AM in Department P at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • Hearing01/13/2020 at 09:00 AM in Department P at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • Hearing12/02/2019 at 08:30 AM in Department P at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Hearing on Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement (CCP 877.6)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • Hearing12/02/2019 at 08:30 AM in Department P at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department P; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department P; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment (Power Edge Solutions Inc. AKA PES CONTRO) - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department P; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment (Power Edge Solutions Inc. AKA PES CONTRO) - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • DocketNotice of Continuance of PES' Hearing for Motion for Summary Judgment and Case Management Conference and Notice of Ruling Re PES Ex Parte Applicaiton to Specially Set Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment; Filed by POWER EDGE SOLUTIONS, INC. AKA PES CONTRO (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • DocketDeclaration (Declaration of George Knopfler In Support of Defendant Power Edge Solutions, Inc. aka PES Controls' Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement); Filed by POWER EDGE SOLUTIONS, INC. AKA PES CONTRO (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • DocketMotion re: (Defendant Power Edge Solutions, Inc. aka PES Controls' Notice of Motion and Motion for Good Faith Settlement Determination Under CCP 877.6); Filed by POWER EDGE SOLUTIONS, INC. AKA PES CONTRO (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
295 More Docket Entries
  • 01/09/2015
  • DocketNtc of Removal to Federal Court; Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2015
  • DocketNotice of Removal to Federal Court; Filed by Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2014
  • DocketRAYTHEON COMPANYS ANSWER TO LAURENCE JOHNSONS COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2014
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2014
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2014
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2014
  • DocketSummons; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2014
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. NEGLIGENCE; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2014
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2014
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by LAURENCE JOHNSON (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC562444    Hearing Date: December 02, 2019    Dept: P

 

TENTATIVE RULING

Laurence Johnson v. The Raytheon Company et al., Case No. BC562444

PES’ Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement [CCP §877.6(a)(1)]

Hearing Date December 2, 2019

No tentative posted. Settled in its entirety per plaintiff’s counsel.