Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/24/2016 at 10:42:40 (UTC).

LAURA VEGA VS VICTOR MANUEL VERDUZCO

Case Summary

On 10/28/2011 LAURA VEGA filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against VICTOR MANUEL VERDUZCO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GORDON, SCOTT M. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3965

  • Filing Date:

    10/28/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

GORDON, SCOTT M

 

Party Details

Petitioner

VEGA LAURA

Respondent

VERDUZCO VICTOR MANUEL

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/12/2013
  • Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2013
  • Notice-Entry-Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2012
  • Proof of Service-Summons & Com Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2012
  • Request-Enter Default Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2012
  • Judgment-Package Received-2336

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2012
  • Judgment-Package Received-2336

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2012
  • Declaration-Serv Pre Dec Dis Inc Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2012
  • Declaration-Default Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2012
  • Request-Enter Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2012
  • Judgment-Package Received-2336 Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2012
  • Notice-Status Conference-POS (notice returned by USPS )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2011
  • Summons-Family Law Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2011
  • Petition Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less