This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/03/2016 at 13:17:16 (UTC).

LATRIYA S ARMSTEAD ET AL VS MANGEN ENTERPRISES INC

Case Summary

On 10/23/2014 LATRIYA S ARMSTEAD filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against MANGEN ENTERPRISES INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1747

  • Filing Date:

    10/23/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff, Petitioner and Guardian Ad Litem

ARMSTEAD LATRIYA S.

Defendants and Respondents

BURGER KING

DOES 1 TO 50

MANGEN ENTERPRISES INC.

Minor

THOMPSON TARAGI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff, Petitioner and Minor Attorney

LAW OFFICE OF SILVERMAN & GOLDSZER

 

Court Documents

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM ? CIVIL

10/23/2014: APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM ? CIVIL

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

10/23/2014: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

SUMMONS

11/6/2014: SUMMONS

DECLARATION OF RONALD I. GOLDSZER AND REQUEST FOR CONTINAUANCE OF TRJAL

4/5/2016: DECLARATION OF RONALD I. GOLDSZER AND REQUEST FOR CONTINAUANCE OF TRJAL

Minute Order

4/7/2016: Minute Order

NOT FOUND CR NON SERVICE RETURN

4/15/2016: NOT FOUND CR NON SERVICE RETURN

NOTICE OF POSTING OF JURY FEES

5/10/2016: NOTICE OF POSTING OF JURY FEES

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

5/10/2016: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

5/10/2016: DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

Unknown

5/10/2016: Unknown

Minute Order

7/22/2016: Minute Order

Minute Order

7/22/2016: Minute Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/06/2014
  • Summons Issued Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2014
  • Summons Filed Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2014
  • Ord Apptng Guardian Ad Litem (FOR TARAJI THOMPSON ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2014
  • Application-Miscellaneous (TARAGI THOMPSON GUARDIAN AD LITEM ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2014
  • Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less