Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/07/2016 at 20:14:35 (UTC).

LARION KRAYZMAN VS. L & J ASSETS ET. AL.

Case Summary

On 06/11/2013 LARION KRAYZMAN filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against L J ASSETS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are LISA HART COLE and AMY D. HOGUE. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1005

  • Filing Date:

    06/11/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Santa Monica Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

LISA HART COLE

AMY D. HOGUE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KRAYZMAN LARION

Defendants

BAG FUND

HACKER RONALD

L & J ASSETS

L & J ASSETS LLC

DOES 1 THROUGH 100 INCLUSIVE

BAG FUND LLC

HACKER RON

HACKER RONEN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

EVANS NEIL C.

Defendant Attorneys

FASEN & ASSOCIATES

RYAN JUSTIN T.

COLEMAN BARRY G.

LEVINE JOHN LAW OFFICES OF

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/16/2015
  • Notice of Ruling Filed by Judgment Creditor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2015
  • Objection (TO LARION KRAYZMAN'S DECLARATION ) Filed by Attorney for Moving Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2015
  • Opposition (TO MOTION FOR ASSIGNMENT ORDER DECLARATION OF BARRY G. COLEMAN IN SUPPORT THEREOF ) Filed by Attorney for Moving Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2015
  • Abstract of Judgment Issued (abstract issued and placed in atty folder for abc ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2015
  • Abstract of Judgment Issued (abstract issued and placed in atty folder for ABC ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2015
  • Order (ON DEFENDANT BAG FUND, LLC'S MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AGAINST PLAINTIFF ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2015
  • Order (ON DEFENDANT RON HACKER'S MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AGAINST PLAINTIFF ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2014
  • Memo of Costs Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2014
  • Notice (OF NO OPPOSITION HAS BEEN RECEIVED TO MOTION TO QUASH ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2014
  • Notice (OF NO OPPOSITION ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 07/11/2014
  • Motion to Quash (SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT (DEFT BAG FUND, LLC) ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2014
  • Motion to Quash (SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT (DEFT RON HACKER) ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2014
  • Proof of Service of Summons & Com (INCOMPLETE ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2014
  • NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE (OF HEARING ) Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2014
  • Notice of Ruling (SPECIALLY APPEARING FOR DEFT ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2013
  • Notice-Related Cases (BC336017 FILED 7-1-05 ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2013
  • Motion to Quash Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2013
  • Order-Court Fee Waiver (AS TO PLFF LARION KRAYZMAN. ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2013
  • Request-Waive Court Fees Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2013
  • Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: SC121005    Hearing Date: December 08, 2020    Dept: O

SC121005 LARION KRAYZMAN VS. L & J ASSETS ET. AL.Motion for Order compelling responses post judgmentJudgment Creditor BAG Fund LLC’s Motion to Compel Responses to Post Judgment Demands for Production is GRANTED pursuant to CCP §§708.030 and 2031.300.  Judgment Creditor served Krayzman with Demands for Production on 8-14-20.  Krayzman failed to serve any response.  Judgment Debtor Krayzman is ordered to serve responses without objection in 10 days.  Krayzman is also ordered to pay sanctions in the amount of $1,460 within 10 days. (4 hours @ $350/hr plus $60 filing fee).  

Case Number: SC121005    Hearing Date: September 29, 2020    Dept: O

Case Name: Krayzman v. L&J Assets, et al.

Case No.: SC121005

Hearing: 9-29-20

Calendar #: 8

______________________________________________________________________________

SUBJECT: MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO POST JUDGMENT INTERROGATORIES

MOVING PARTY: Judgment Creditor/Defendant BAG Fund LLC

RESP. PARTY: None as of 9-24-20

TENTATIVE RULING

Judgment Creditor BAG Fund LLC’s Motion to Compel Responses to Post Judgment Interrogatories is GRANTED pursuant to CCP §§708.020 and 2030.290. Judgment Creditor served Krayzman with interrogatories on 6-24-20. Krayzman failed to serve any response. Judgment Debtor Krayzman is ordered to serve responses without objection in 10 days. Krayzman is also ordered to pay sanctions in the amount of $1,460 (4 hours @ $350/hr plus $60 filing fee).

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where L & J ASSETS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where BAG FUND LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer COLEMAN BARRY G.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RYAN, JUSTIN T.