Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/10/2020 at 01:51:24 (UTC).

LARION KRAYZMAN VS. DAVID H. FREDRICKSON, ET.AL.

Case Summary

On 10/07/2009 LARION KRAYZMAN filed a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit against DAVID H FREDRICKSON. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are JOHN L. SEGAL, IRVING SHIMER, LISA HART COLE, RICHARD A. STONE, CESAR C. SARMIENTO, JOSEPH S. BIDERMAN and GERALD ROSENBERG. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5201

  • Filing Date:

    10/07/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

JOHN L. SEGAL

IRVING SHIMER

LISA HART COLE

RICHARD A. STONE

CESAR C. SARMIENTO

JOSEPH S. BIDERMAN

GERALD ROSENBERG

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

KRAYZMAN BORIS

KRAYZMAN LARION

Claimants

BAGFUND LLC

REEL EM IN INC.

Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and Not Classified By Court

HACKER RONALD

FABE JACQUELINE M.

L&J ASSETS

1538 CAHUENGA PARTNERS

RON HACKER & ASSOCIATES

BOGORAD TANYA

FREDRICKSON DAVID H. LAW OFFICES OF

HACKER RON

HACKER RONIN

FREDRICKSON. DAVID H.

HACKER RONEN

H. FREDRICKSON. DAVID

BAG FUND LLC

LANE ESTRELITA

FASEN LEO

Interested Parties and Not Classified By Court

BAG FUND LLC

LANE ESTRELITA

7 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

KRAYZMAN LARION

EVANS NEIL C.

HOLZER PETER C. LAW OFFICES OF

Claimant and Defendant Attorneys

FASEN & ASSOCIATES

COLEMAN BARRY G.

WOOD STEVEN G.

JOHN LEVINE

SUN KEVIN H.

ATYRIA S. CLARK & ASSOCIATES

CLARK ATYRIA & ASSOCIATES

LEVINE JOHN

LERNER MARSHALL A.

HOFFMAN LARRY M

JUAREZ CHRISTIAN R.

QUIGG VINCENT J. LAW OFFICES OF

SCHULTZ DAVID N.

BECK WILLIAM

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

LERNER MARSHALL A.

Other Attorneys

MOJARRO LAW P.C.

4 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF LIEN (ATTACHMENT - ENFORCEMENT OF JUDGMENT)

8/20/2013: NOTICE OF LIEN (ATTACHMENT - ENFORCEMENT OF JUDGMENT)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/20/2015
  • Docketat 08:29 AM in Department K; Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination (Judgment Debtor Examination Hrg; Matter Placed Off Calendar) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2015
  • Docketat 08:29 am in Department WEK, Gerald Rosenberg, Presiding; Judgment Debtor Examination Hrg (TO RON HACKER, AKA RONIN HACKER) - Matter Placed Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2015
  • DocketApplication ; Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2015
  • DocketApplication - Miscellaneous (AND ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION - ENFORCEMENT OF JUDGMENT - JUDGMENT DEBTOR - THIRD PERSON ); Filed by Plaintiff & Plaintiff In Pro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2015
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by RON HACKER (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2015
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Judgment Creditor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2015
  • Docketat 08:31 AM in Department K; Unknown Event Type - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2015
  • Docketat 08:31 am in Department WEK, Gerald Rosenberg, Presiding; Motion (TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO POSTJUDGMENT INTERROGATORIES) - Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2015
  • Docketat 08:31 AM in Department K; (Motion; Motion Denied) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2015
  • Docketat 08:31 am in Department WEK, Gerald Rosenberg, Presiding; Motion (FOR ASSIGNMENT OF PAYMENTS) - Motion Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
766 More Docket Entries
  • 10/07/2009
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2009
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2009
  • DocketOrder-Court Fee Waiver; Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2009
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2009
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees; Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2009
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Boris Krayzman (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2009
  • DocketComplaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2009
  • DocketRequest-Waive Court Fees; Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2009
  • DocketProof of Service (SERVED: 1538 CAHUENA PARTNERS, LLC. -NOTICE OF RELATED CASES- ); Filed by Plaintiff & Plaintiff In Pro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2009
  • DocketProof of Service (SERVED: L&J ASSETS, LLC. -NOTICE OF RELATED CASES- ); Filed by Plaintiff & Plaintiff In Pro Per

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: SC105201    Hearing Date: October 22, 2020    Dept: O

Case Name: Krayzman, et al. v. Frederickson, et al.

Case No.: SC105201

Hearing: 10-22-20

Calendar #: 6

Notice: NOT OK

Complaint Filed: 10/7/09

Motion C/O: N/A

Discovery C/O: N/A

Trial Date: Passed

______________________________________________________________________________

SUBJECT: (1) MOTION FOR ASSIGNMENT OF RENTS AND/OR COMMISSIONS

(2) MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING RESPONSES WITHOUT OBJECTION TO POST-JUDGMENT INTERROGATORIES (SET ONE) FROM; REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS

(3) MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING RESPONSES WITHOUT OBJECTION TO POST-JUDGMENT REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS (SET ONE) FROM L&J ASSETS, LCC; REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS

MOVING PARTY: (1)-(3) Plaintiff Larion Krayzman

RESP. PARTY: (1)-(3) Defendant Bag Fund LLC

TENTATIVE RULINGS

(1) PLAINTIFF’S MOTION FOR ASSIGNMENT OF RENTS AND/OR COMMISSIONS is DENIED. Bag Fund LLC’s RJN is GRANTED.

Preliminarily, Bag Fund LLC filed a notice of lien in this action as a judgment creditor of Krayzman. CCP §708.440(a) does not preclude Krayzman from applying to the Court for a writ or other method of enforcing the judgment obtained in this action. See CCP §708.440(a)(“ judgment recovered in the action…in favor of the judgment debtor may not be enforced by a writ or otherwise…without…authorization by order of the court obtained under subdivision (b)”). Krayzman, therefore, is entitled to bring this motion for assignment of rents and the Court has the authority to grant or deny it in its discretion. CCP §708.440(b)(“Upon application by the judgment debtor, the court in which…the judgment procured therein is entered may, in its discretion, after a hearing, make an order described in subdivision (a) that may include such terms and conditions as the court deems necessary.”)

Krayzman filed this identical motion on 2-13-15, when the matter was before Judgment Rosenberg, attaching the exact same list of L&J Assets’ alleged accounts receivables. See Bag Funds LLC’s RJN, Ex. 2. The Court denied the motion on 4-14-15 on grounds that the declaration was insufficient. Id. at Ex. 4. The exact same declaration and list of receivables is attached to this identical motion. The motion is denied as an improper and untimely motion for reconsideration. The declaration is still insufficient. The alleged “accounts receivables” attached as Exhibit 1 is not properly authenticated and given that it is identical to the list attached to the 4-14-15 motion there is insufficient evidence provided that the entities identified on that list are still obligated to make payments to L&J Assets.

Bag Fund LLC argues there is a stay on all of Krayzman’s collection efforts until he returns $12,000 to Bag Fund LLC in accordance with the 10-22-12 order. Bag Fund LLC relies on the Court’s 12-20-12 order as evidence of the stay. However, the 12-20-12 Order indicates, “Pending compliance with October 22, 20122 [sic] Minute Order, the court orders a Stay on Collections. Stay shall remain in effect thru and including 2/7/2013.” See Bag Fund LLC’s RJN, Ex. 6. Bag Fund LLC fails to submit any order indicating the stay was extended past 2-7-13. Krayzman did not obtain his judgment in this action until 3-5-13, after the stay was created on 10-22-12 and after it terminated on 2-7-13. According to Bag Fund’s 4-12-13 Notice of Ruling, the Court ordered Krayzman not to proceed with any collection efforts until final Judgment was entered and then only upon the party to whom the judgment is entered, L&J Assets, LLC. See Docket, 4-12-13 Notice of Ruling. Judgment was entered on 7-30-13. See Docket, 7-30-13 Judgment. There is no evidence that there is a standing order precluding Krayzman from engaging in collection efforts at this time.

Finally, the motion for assignment of rents was not served on L&J Assets, LLC. The proof of electronic service filed on 6-2-20 indicates electronic service on John Levine, esq. at 4-29-20. Based on Levine’s declaration in opposition to Plaintiff’s motion for sanctions against him, he has not represented L&J Assets, LLC since October 2013 and has never been a manager or agent for service of process of L&J Assets, LLC. See Opposition filed on 10-14-20, Dec. of J. Levine, ¶¶2-4, 6. Plaintiff has since withdrawn the motion for sanctions against Levine. See Notice of Withdrawal filed on 10-19-20.

--------------------------------------------------------

(2) PLAINTIFF KRAYZMAN’S MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING RESPONSES WITHOUT OBJECTION TO POST-JUDGMENT INTERROGATORIES (SET ONE) FROM AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS IS DENIED; AND,

(3) PLAINTIFF KRAYZMAN’S MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING RESPONSES WITHOUT OBJECTION TO POST-JUDGMENT REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS (SET ONE) FROM L&J ASSETS, LCC AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS IS DENIED.

Bag Fund LLC’s RJN is GRANTED.

Plaintiff served the subject discovery on John Levine. As discussed in connection with the motion for assignment of rents, John Levine has not represented L&J Assets in approximately 7 years. As such, the subject discovery was never properly served or received by L&J Assets and no order compelling them to respond may be issued.

Plaintiff also seeks sanctions against Ron Hacker, as the “principal” of L&J Assets LLC, Vincent J. Quigg (Hacker’s counsel), and Leo Fasen. Plaintiff fails to provide any basis to hold any of these individuals responsible for the response of L&J Assets to post-judgment discovery in this action.

Opposing parties emphasize that L&J Assets is a suspended LLC and cannot defend or appear in this action. Opposing parties also argue L&J Assets has no more assets, because all assets have been assigned or transferred. L&J Assets’ corporate status and its solvency is not relevant to the discovery motions before it, nor would either fact legally preclude Krayzman from attempting to collect on his judgment.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where REEL EM IN INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where L & J ASSETS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where 1538 CAHUENGA PARTNERS LLC is a litigant