This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 08:51:05 (UTC).

VEROS CREDIT, LLC VS. LAQUENT D. FOBBS

Case Summary

On 12/05/2016 VEROS CREDIT, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against LAQUENT D FOBBS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5971

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Cross Defendants and Plaintiffs

VEROS CREDIT LLC A NEVADA LIMITED

SOUTHCOAST AUTOMOTIVE A BUSINESS ENTITY

Defendants

GALAXY AUTO MALL

FOBBS LAQUENT

Cross Plaintiff

FOBBS LAQUENT D. AN INDIVIDUAL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Cross Plaintiff Attorney

GLASSEY & SMITH

Cross Defendant Attorney

MADISON & HARBOR ALC

 

Court Documents

Judgment

6/24/2019: Judgment

Order

7/20/2018: Order

Substitution of Attorney

7/27/2018: Substitution of Attorney

Notice of Motion

8/2/2018: Notice of Motion

Declaration

8/2/2018: Declaration

Ex Parte Application

8/3/2018: Ex Parte Application

Ex Parte Application

8/3/2018: Ex Parte Application

Ex Parte Application

8/3/2018: Ex Parte Application

Notice of Ruling

8/7/2018: Notice of Ruling

Notice of Ruling

8/7/2018: Notice of Ruling

Notice

8/8/2018: Notice

Order

8/15/2018: Order

Notice of Entry of Judgment

8/16/2018: Notice of Entry of Judgment

Notice of Entry of Judgment or Order

8/16/2018: Notice of Entry of Judgment or Order

Order

8/23/2018: Order

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

8/24/2018: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice of Ruling

8/24/2018: Notice of Ruling

Notice of Ruling

8/24/2018: Notice of Ruling

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/24/2019
  • DocketJudgment (Amended); Filed by VEROS CREDIT, LLC, a Nevada limited (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • DocketNotice (of Ruling); Filed by VEROS CREDIT, LLC, a Nevada limited (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department C; Hearing on Motion for Attorney Fees - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • DocketOrder (re; hearing of 4/5/19); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Attorney Fees)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • DocketJudgment; Filed by VEROS CREDIT, LLC, a Nevada limited (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department C; Non-Appearance Case Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department C; Ruling on Submitted Matter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter: HEARING DATE OF 2/28/19;)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING TO DEFENDANT) of 03/08/2019 and minute order and Order dated March 8, 2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
105 More Docket Entries
  • 12/05/2016
  • DocketCross-Compl fld - Summons Issued; Filed by LAQUENT FOBBS (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2016
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Cross-Complainant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2016
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2016
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by LAQUENT FOBBS (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2016
  • DocketFirst Amended Complaint; Filed by VEROS CREDIT, LLC, a Nevada limited (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2016
  • DocketDeclaration; Filed by LAQUENT FOBBS (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2016
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by VEROS CREDIT, LLC, a Nevada limited (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2016
  • DocketRtn of Service of Summons & Compl; Filed by Plaintiff and Cross-Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2016
  • DocketComplaint filed-Summons Issued; Filed by VEROS CREDIT, LLC, a Nevada limited (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2016
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Plaintiff and Cross-Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GALAXY AUTO MALL A BUSINESS ENTITY FORM is a litigant

Latest cases where Veros Credit, LLC is a litigant