This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/28/2019 at 17:48:55 (UTC).

LANA PAIGE ARRINGTON VS BNB ASSET MANAGEMENT LLC ET AL

Case Summary

On 09/27/2016 LANA PAIGE ARRINGTON filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against BNB ASSET MANAGEMENT LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RAFAEL A. ONGKEKO. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5224

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2016

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

RAFAEL A. ONGKEKO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

ARRINGTON LANA PAIGE

Respondents, Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

WILSHIRE SKYLINE INC.

MATHERS KENDALL

DOES 1 - 50

BNB ASSET MANAGEMENT LLC

OSMAN MARK

WS MANAGEMENT LLC

BENOIT MORGAN

1818-1830 CHEROKEE LLC

BOLLAG DAVID

WSI MANAGEMENT LLC

WILSHIRE SKYLINE LLC

WILSHIRE SKYLINE LP

NISSEL BRIAN

Defendant, Respondent and Cross Defendant

MATHERS KENDALL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

ZEESMAN ALEXANDER J. ESQ.

CONLOGUE KEVIN SHAWN

ZEESMAN ALEXANDER J.

Defendant Attorneys

SHEEHAN LESLIE A.

BRANSON TIMOTHY K.

VANARELLI CHRISTINA SAMAYOA

Cross Plaintiff Attorney

JORDAN DAVID LEE

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL

1/9/2018: NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL

DEFENDANTS' BNB ASSET MANAGEMENT LLC, WILSHIRE SKYLINE, INC, MARK OSMAN, 1818-1830 CHEROKEE, LLC, AND WILSHIRE SKYLINE LP'S OBJECTION TO PLAINTIFF LANA ARRINGTON'S NOTICE OF RULING REGARDING EX PARTE

2/13/2018: DEFENDANTS' BNB ASSET MANAGEMENT LLC, WILSHIRE SKYLINE, INC, MARK OSMAN, 1818-1830 CHEROKEE, LLC, AND WILSHIRE SKYLINE LP'S OBJECTION TO PLAINTIFF LANA ARRINGTON'S NOTICE OF RULING REGARDING EX PARTE

DEFENDANTS' MOTION INLIMINE #19 IOPPOSEDI MOTION INLIMINE TO EXCLUDE PLAINTIFF'S USE OF THE ?REPTILE THEORY? FILED BY DEFENDANTS, BNB ASSET MANAGEMENT LLC, WILSHIRE SKYLINE, INC., MARK OSMAN, 1818-183

8/6/2018: DEFENDANTS' MOTION INLIMINE #19 IOPPOSEDI MOTION INLIMINE TO EXCLUDE PLAINTIFF'S USE OF THE ?REPTILE THEORY? FILED BY DEFENDANTS, BNB ASSET MANAGEMENT LLC, WILSHIRE SKYLINE, INC., MARK OSMAN, 1818-183

DEFENDANTS' MOTION IN LIMINE #8 [OPPOSED]; ETC.

8/8/2018: DEFENDANTS' MOTION IN LIMINE #8 [OPPOSED]; ETC.

PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE NUMBER 6-EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF PLAINTIFF ALLEGEDLY PUTTING HER HEAD THROUGH A WALL

8/9/2018: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE NUMBER 6-EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF PLAINTIFF ALLEGEDLY PUTTING HER HEAD THROUGH A WALL

PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE NUMBER 7- EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF PLAINTIFF'S PRIOR DRUG USE

8/9/2018: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE NUMBER 7- EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF PLAINTIFF'S PRIOR DRUG USE

PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE NUMBER 3-EXCLUDE ANY SUGGESTION THAT BRUNO WILL BE HARMED BY ANY RESULT OF THIS LAWSUIT

8/9/2018: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE NUMBER 3-EXCLUDE ANY SUGGESTION THAT BRUNO WILL BE HARMED BY ANY RESULT OF THIS LAWSUIT

DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE #3- EXCLUDE ANY SUGGESTION THAT BRUNO WILL BE HARMED BY ANY RESULT OF THIS LAWSUIT; ETC.

8/16/2018: DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE #3- EXCLUDE ANY SUGGESTION THAT BRUNO WILL BE HARMED BY ANY RESULT OF THIS LAWSUIT; ETC.

DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE #2- EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF PLAINTIFF'S PRIOR DOG BUD; DECLARATION OF LESLIE A. SHEEHAN, ESQ.

8/16/2018: DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE #2- EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF PLAINTIFF'S PRIOR DOG BUD; DECLARATION OF LESLIE A. SHEEHAN, ESQ.

DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE #7- EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF PLAINTIFF'S PRIOR DRUG USE; DECLARATION OF LESLIE A. SHEEHAN, ESQ.

8/16/2018: DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE #7- EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF PLAINTIFF'S PRIOR DRUG USE; DECLARATION OF LESLIE A. SHEEHAN, ESQ.

DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE #1- EXCLUDE EVIDENCE THAT PLAINTIFF IS NOT MAKING A LOSS OF EARNINGS CLAIM; DECLARATION OF LESLIE A. SHEEHAN, ESQ.

8/16/2018: DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE #1- EXCLUDE EVIDENCE THAT PLAINTIFF IS NOT MAKING A LOSS OF EARNINGS CLAIM; DECLARATION OF LESLIE A. SHEEHAN, ESQ.

PLAINTIFF'S PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTEONS

8/23/2018: PLAINTIFF'S PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTEONS

PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION IN LIMINE NUMBER 4

8/23/2018: PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION IN LIMINE NUMBER 4

Minute Order

9/11/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

9/24/2018: Minute Order

Notice

11/5/2018: Notice

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

10/5/2016: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

Minute Order

9/20/2017: Minute Order

212 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/27/2018
  • Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Filed by BNB Asset Management LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Lana Paige Arrington (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Filed by BNB Asset Management LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • Notice (Of Entry Of Order Determining Good Faith Settlement); Filed by 1818-1830 Cherokee LLC (Defendant); BNB Asset Management LLC (Defendant); Mark Osman (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 73, Rafael A. Ongkeko, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Application for Good Faith Settlement) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 73, Rafael A. Ongkeko, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Failure to File Judgment) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 73, Rafael A. Ongkeko, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Entry of Judgment Against Party Mathers or Trial Setting Conference on the Cross-Complaint) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by 1818-1830 Cherokee LLC (Defendant); BNB Asset Management LLC (Defendant); Mark Osman (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • Minute Order ( ((1) Order to Show Cause Re: Entry of Judgment Against Party M...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by BNB Asset Management LLC (Cross-Complainant); Wilshire Skyline, Inc. (Cross-Complainant); Mark Osman (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
435 More Docket Entries
  • 10/11/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2016
  • Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by Lana Paige Arrington (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2016
  • NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT - CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2016
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Lana Paige Arrington (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2016
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Lana Paige Arrington (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2016
  • COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. STATUTORY STRICT LIABILITY - (CIV. CODE. SECTION 3342); ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by Lana Paige Arrington (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2016
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BNB ASSET MANAGEMENT is a litigant

Latest cases where WILSHIRE SKYLINE INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ZEESMAN ALEXANDER JOSHUA