This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/08/2019 at 02:05:06 (UTC).

LAKE PLAZA, LLC VS. ENVIRONMENTAL AUDIT, INC., ET-AL

Case Summary

On 09/13/2016 LAKE PLAZA, LLC filed a Contract - Professional Negligence lawsuit against ENVIRONMENTAL AUDIT, INC , ET-AL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Compton Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MAURICE A. LEITER. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8558

  • Filing Date:

    09/13/2016

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Professional Negligence

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Compton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MAURICE A. LEITER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LAKE PLAZA LLC

Defendants

DOES 1-10

ENVIRONMENTAL AUDIT INC.

Other

LOS ANGELES SUPERIOR COURT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

AQUA TERRA AERIS (ATA) LAW GROUP

MACLEAR MATTHEW C.

Defendant Attorney

GORDON & REES LAW OFFICES OF

 

Court Documents

Unknown

7/3/2018: Unknown

Notice of Settlement

10/5/2018: Notice of Settlement

Proof of Service by Mail

10/5/2018: Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Mail

10/5/2018: Proof of Service by Mail

Unknown

10/8/2018: Unknown

Request for Dismissal

11/5/2018: Request for Dismissal

Proof of Service by Mail

11/5/2018: Proof of Service by Mail

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/19/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department A, Maurice A. Leiter, Presiding; Order to Show Cause - Hearing (reDismissal Date) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • Proof of Service by Mail; Filed by LAKE PLAZA, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by LAKE PLAZA, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • at 09:30 AM in Department A, Maurice A. Leiter, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • at 09:30 AM in Department A, Maurice A. Leiter, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2018
  • Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • Proof of Service by Mail; Filed by LAKE PLAZA, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • Notice of Settlement; Filed by LAKE PLAZA, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • Proof of Service by Mail; Filed by LAKE PLAZA, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Notice RE: Continuance of Hearing and Order

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 02/02/2017
  • Case Management Statement; Filed by ENVIRONMENTAL AUDIT, INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by LAKE PLAZA, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • Case Management Statement; Filed by LAKE PLAZA, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2016
  • Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by LAKE PLAZA, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2016
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by LAKE PLAZA, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2016
  • Answer; Filed by ENVIRONMENTAL AUDIT, INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2016
  • Summons; Filed by LAKE PLAZA, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2016
  • Summons; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2016
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by LAKE PLAZA, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less