This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/08/2021 at 10:09:47 (UTC).

LA HABRA MUSIC CENTER CO., INC VS LOWELL JOINT SCHOOL DIST.

Case Summary

On 05/22/2012 LA HABRA MUSIC CENTER CO , INC filed a Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation lawsuit against LOWELL JOINT SCHOOL DIST. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MARGARET M. BERNAL and YVONNE T. SANCHEZ. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1194

  • Filing Date:

    05/22/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MARGARET M. BERNAL

YVONNE T. SANCHEZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LA HABRA MUSIC CENTER CO. INC.

Defendants

FLETCHER JEREMY

LOWELL JOINT SCHOOL DISTRICT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SASSI ROBIN JEAN LAW OFFICES OF

Defendant Attorney

MCCUNE & HARBER

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/05/2013
  • DocketNotice; Filed by JEREMY FLETCHER (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2013
  • DocketOrder of Dismissal with Prejudice; Filed by JEREMY FLETCHER (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2013
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department F; (Order to Show Cause; Off Calendar) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2013
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department C; Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2013
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department C; Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2013
  • DocketOrder; Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2013
  • DocketReply to Opposition; Filed by JEREMY FLETCHER (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2013
  • DocketReply to Opposition; Filed by JEREMY FLETCHER (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2013
  • DocketOpposition; Filed by LA HABRA MUSIC CENTER CO., INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2013
  • DocketOpposition; Filed by LA HABRA MUSIC CENTER CO., INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 08/31/2012
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by LA HABRA MUSIC CENTER CO., INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2012
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by LOWELL JOINT SCHOOL DISTRICT (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2012
  • DocketNotice; Filed by LOWELL JOINT SCHOOL DISTRICT (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2012
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department C; Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike (Hearing on Demurrer; Matter Placed Off Calendar) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2012
  • DocketFirst Amended Complaint; Filed by LA HABRA MUSIC CENTER CO., INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2012
  • DocketDeft's Ntc of Hrng on Demurrer; Filed by LOWELL JOINT SCHOOL DISTRICT (Defendant); JEREMY FLETCHER (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2012
  • DocketMotion to Strike; Filed by LOWELL JOINT SCHOOL DISTRICT (Defendant); JEREMY FLETCHER (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2012
  • DocketComplaint filed-Summons Issued; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2012
  • DocketSummons; Filed by LA HABRA MUSIC CENTER CO., INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2012
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LOWELL JOINT SCHOOL DISTRICT A CA PUBLIC is a litigant