This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/06/2019 at 11:31:51 (UTC).

L A COMMERCIAL GROUP INC VS GARDA CL TECHNICAL SERVICES INC

Case Summary

On 09/11/2015 L A COMMERCIAL GROUP INC filed a Property - Commercial Eviction lawsuit against GARDA CL TECHNICAL SERVICES INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is TERESA SANCHEZ-GORDON. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4446

  • Filing Date:

    09/11/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Commercial Eviction

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

TERESA SANCHEZ-GORDON

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

CONTINENTAL COMMERCIAL GROUP

L.A. COMMERCIAL GROUP INC.

Defendants and Respondents

ATI SYSTEMS INTERNATIONAL INC.

DOES 1 TO 10

GARDA CL TECHNICAL SERVICES INC.

GARDAWORLD

GARDAWORLD CASH SERVICES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

LEMOINE JESSICA L.

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT-CONTRACT

9/11/2015: COMPLAINT-CONTRACT

SUMMONS

9/11/2015: SUMMONS

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

9/14/2015: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

10/8/2015: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

10/14/2015: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

AMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

10/14/2015: AMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

AMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

10/14/2015: AMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

10/14/2015: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

11/6/2015: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

Minute Order

1/7/2016: Minute Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/07/2016
  • at 09:00 AM in Department 74; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Off Calendar) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2016
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2015
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by L.A. Commercial Group, Inc. (Plaintiff); Continental Commercial Group (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2015
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2015
  • AMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2015
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2015
  • AMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2015
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by L.A. Commercial Group, Inc. (Plaintiff); Continental Commercial Group (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2015
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by L.A. Commercial Group, Inc. (Plaintiff); Continental Commercial Group (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2015
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by L.A. Commercial Group, Inc. (Plaintiff); Continental Commercial Group (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2015
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2015
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by L.A. Commercial Group, Inc. (Plaintiff); Continental Commercial Group (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2015
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2015
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by L.A. Commercial Group, Inc. (Plaintiff); Continental Commercial Group (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2015
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2015
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2015
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2015
  • Complaint; Filed by L.A. Commercial Group, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2015
  • COMPLAINT-CONTRACT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ATI SYSTEMS INTERNATIONAL INCORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where GARDA CL TECHNICAL SERVICES, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where GARDAWORLD CASH SERVICES INC. is a litigant