This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/27/2021 at 09:43:22 (UTC).

KYUNG RHAN RHA VS SYNERGY CAPITAL AND METROPOLITAN LIFE INS

Case Summary

On 09/30/2013 KYUNG RHAN RHA filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against SYNERGY CAPITAL AND METROPOLITAN LIFE INS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MITCHELL L. BECKLOFF and ABRAHAM KHAN. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2946

  • Filing Date:

    09/30/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MITCHELL L. BECKLOFF

ABRAHAM KHAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

RHA KYUNG RHAN

RHA KYUNG N

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1-100

KIM JOHN

METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY

SYNCIS INC.

SYNCIS INSURANCE SOLUTIONS INC.

SYNERGY CAPITAL AND METROPOLITAN LIFE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

MATISON & MARGOLESE A LAW CORP

AKBARI A. ILYAS ESQ.

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

HINSHAW & CULBERTSON LLP

COURTEAU DIANA L. ESQ.

EDGERTON & WEAVER

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

10/18/2013: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

10/18/2013: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS

1/7/2014: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

1/9/2014: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER OF DEFENDANT METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY

1/9/2014: OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER OF DEFENDANT METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY

PLAINTIFF?S NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

2/6/2014: PLAINTIFF?S NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

PLAINTIFF'S DECLARATION OF REASONABLE DILIGENCE

5/9/2014: PLAINTIFF'S DECLARATION OF REASONABLE DILIGENCE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANTS SYNCIS, INC.. AND JOHN KIM

6/24/2014: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANTS SYNCIS, INC.. AND JOHN KIM

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANT SYNCIS INSURANCE SOLUTIONS, INC.

6/27/2014: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANT SYNCIS INSURANCE SOLUTIONS, INC.

Minute Order -

8/15/2014: Minute Order -

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

10/30/2014: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

CIVIL DEPOSIT -

11/25/2014: CIVIL DEPOSIT -

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS IN THE AMOUNT OF $3,000

12/24/2014: MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS IN THE AMOUNT OF $3,000

DECLARATION OF ELIZABETH LOWERY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING FURTHER RESPONSES TO INTERROGATORIES AND REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS

12/24/2014: DECLARATION OF ELIZABETH LOWERY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING FURTHER RESPONSES TO INTERROGATORIES AND REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION BY DEFENDANTS SYNCIS INSURANCE SOLUTIONS, INC. AND JOHN KIM FOR ORDER COMPELLING FURTHER RESPONSES TO INTERROGATORIES AND REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS

12/24/2014: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION BY DEFENDANTS SYNCIS INSURANCE SOLUTIONS, INC. AND JOHN KIM FOR ORDER COMPELLING FURTHER RESPONSES TO INTERROGATORIES AND REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS

DECLARATION OF ELIZABETH LOWERY IN SUPPORT OF KIM DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

2/18/2015: DECLARATION OF ELIZABETH LOWERY IN SUPPORT OF KIM DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR ALTERNATIVELY, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION BY KIM DEFENDANTS

2/18/2015: SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR ALTERNATIVELY, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION BY KIM DEFENDANTS

STIPULATION

6/15/2015: STIPULATION

72 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/10/2015
  • Docketat 08:32 AM in Department 51; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2015
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 51; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2015
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2015
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2015
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 51; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment (Motion for Summary Judgment; Off Calendar) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2015
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2015
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 51; (Motion to Compel; Matter continued) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2015
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2015
  • DocketSTIPULATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2015
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by John Kim (Defendant); Syncis, Inc. (Defendant); Syncis Insurance Solutions, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
128 More Docket Entries
  • 01/07/2014
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS DECLARATON OF REASONABLE DILIGENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2014
  • DocketNOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2013
  • DocketDemurrer; Filed by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2013
  • DocketMETROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANYS NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2013
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2013
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2013
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2013
  • DocketCOMPLAINT METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY 1. BREACH OF CONTRACT; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2013
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Kyung n Rha (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2013
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer COURTEAU DIANA L. ESQ.