This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/19/2021 at 13:39:57 (UTC).

KWANG TAE KIM VS WASHINGTON MUTUAL BANK ET AL

Case Summary

On 08/05/2013 KWANG TAE KIM filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against WASHINGTON MUTUAL BANK. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MITCHELL L. BECKLOFF, ABRAHAM KHAN and DENNIS J. LANDIN. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7368

  • Filing Date:

    08/05/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MITCHELL L. BECKLOFF

ABRAHAM KHAN

DENNIS J. LANDIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KIM KWANG TAE

Defendants and Respondents

BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON

BANK OF NEW YORK THE

DOES 1 TO 100

JP MORGAN CHASE BANK

QUALITY LOAN SERVICE CORP.

WASHINGTON MUTUAL BANK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CASADO KELLY LAWRENCE

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

KEESAL YOUNG & LOGAN

COUTTS MELISSA ROBBINS ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Declaration - DECLARATION OF PLAINTIFF ISO MOTION TO RECUSE

9/6/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION OF PLAINTIFF ISO MOTION TO RECUSE

DEFENDANTS? REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF ITS DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF?S COMPLAINT

9/13/2013: DEFENDANTS? REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF ITS DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF?S COMPLAINT

PLAINTIFF, KWANG TAE KIM?S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT?S JP MORGAN CHASE BANK,NA FOR ITSELF AND AS ACQUIRER OF CERTAIN ASSETS OF WASHINGTON MUTUAL BANK FROM THE FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION, AS R

10/7/2013: PLAINTIFF, KWANG TAE KIM?S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT?S JP MORGAN CHASE BANK,NA FOR ITSELF AND AS ACQUIRER OF CERTAIN ASSETS OF WASHINGTON MUTUAL BANK FROM THE FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION, AS R

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

1/2/2014: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

DEFENDANTS? REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF ITS DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF?S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

2/28/2014: DEFENDANTS? REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF ITS DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF?S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

8/12/2014: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

9/22/2014: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

10/9/2014: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT -

11/7/2014: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT -

AMENDED DECLARATION OF KWANG TAE KIM IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PACKAGE

5/20/2015: AMENDED DECLARATION OF KWANG TAE KIM IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PACKAGE

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

5/20/2015: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY -

5/20/2016: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY -

DECLARATION OF STEVEN J. BARKIN RE PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE NOTICE AND MOTION TO CORRECT THE JUDGMENT ETTERED ON MAY 20, 2015

5/20/2016: DECLARATION OF STEVEN J. BARKIN RE PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE NOTICE AND MOTION TO CORRECT THE JUDGMENT ETTERED ON MAY 20, 2015

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO VACATE DEFAULT JUDGMENT AGAINST QUALITY LOAN SERVICE CORP.

9/27/2016: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO VACATE DEFAULT JUDGMENT AGAINST QUALITY LOAN SERVICE CORP.

DECLARATION OF JULIE MOLTENI IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO VACATE DEFAULT JUDGMENT AGAINST QUALITY LOAN SERVICE CORP.

9/27/2016: DECLARATION OF JULIE MOLTENI IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO VACATE DEFAULT JUDGMENT AGAINST QUALITY LOAN SERVICE CORP.

Proof of Service -

9/27/2016: Proof of Service -

NOTICE OF LODGMENT OF QUALITY'S NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT AND PLEADINGS IN SUPPORT THEREOF

9/27/2016: NOTICE OF LODGMENT OF QUALITY'S NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT AND PLEADINGS IN SUPPORT THEREOF

ORDER ON STIPULATION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT JUDGMENT OF DEFENDANT QUALITY LOAN SERVICE CORPORATION AND ENTER DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

11/21/2016: ORDER ON STIPULATION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT JUDGMENT OF DEFENDANT QUALITY LOAN SERVICE CORPORATION AND ENTER DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

100 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/06/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 51, Dennis J. Landin, Presiding; Ruling on Submitted Matter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • DocketOrder (Ruling Re: Motion to Vacate Setting Aside of Default Judgment); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 03/06/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 51, Dennis J. Landin, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Vacate (Motion to Vacate Setting Aside of Default Judgment) - Held - Taken under Submission

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Vacate Motion to Vacate Setting Aside of...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 51, Dennis J. Landin, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Vacate (Motion to Vacate Setting Aside of Default Judgment) - Not Held - Rescheduled by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • DocketMotion re: (to Set Aside Court Order of November 21, 2016); Filed by Kwang Tae Kim (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 51, Dennis J. Landin, Presiding; Hearing on Motion - Other (Motion to Recuse Counsel) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion - Other Motion to Recuse Counsel)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
211 More Docket Entries
  • 09/03/2013
  • DocketORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER AFTER HEARING (SUPERIOR COURT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2013
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Kwang Tae Kim (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2013
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2013
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2013
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2013
  • DocketORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2013
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2013
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees; Filed by Kwang Tae Kim (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2013
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: 1) VIOLATIONS OF THE ROSENTHAL ACT; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2013
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Kwang Tae Kim (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC517368    Hearing Date: October 24, 2019    Dept: 51

Plaintiff's Motion to Recuse Counsel is granted.  Attorney Kelly Casado is substituted in as counsel for Plaintiff Kim in place of Attorney Steven Barkin.