This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/24/2019 at 12:23:59 (UTC).

KRUEGER, THOMAS BRADFORD VS KRUEGER, BAHAREH

Case Summary

On 04/04/2016 KRUEGER, THOMAS BRADFORD filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against KRUEGER, BAHAREH. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2269

  • Filing Date:

    04/04/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

KRUEGER THOMAS BRADFORD

Respondent

KRUEGER BAHAREH

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/15/2016
  • DocketDeclaration - Default or Uncontested Judgment FL230 (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Krueger, Thomas - Filed and Entered on 2016-07-15 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2016
  • DocketNotice - Entry of Judgment (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Krueger, Thomas - Filed and Entered on 2016-07-15 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2016
  • DocketJudgment (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Krueger, Thomas - Filed and Entered on 2016-07-15 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2016
  • DocketRequest - Enter Default FL165 (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Krueger, Thomas ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2016
  • DocketDeclaration - Income and Expense (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Krueger, Thomas ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2016
  • DocketMilestone 2 Completed (Entered Date: 06-02-16 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2016
  • DocketDeclaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure (- On Behalf of: Respondent: Krueger, Bahareh ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2016
  • DocketDeclaration (seperate property - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Krueger, Thomas ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2016
  • DocketDeclaration (seperate property - On Behalf of: Respondent: Krueger, Bahareh ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2016
  • DocketJudgment Package Received - Stipulated (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Krueger, Thomas ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2016
  • DocketDeclaration - Income and Expense (- On Behalf of: Respondent: Krueger, Bahareh ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2016
  • DocketDeclaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure (and final decl of disc. - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Krueger, Thomas ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2016
  • DocketNotice - Acknowledgment of Receipt (FL100,110,120, blank 105,Case Assign & 2copies NAR by mail - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Krueger, Thomas - Signed on 2016-04-10 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2016
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons (with 2 copies of NAR - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Krueger, Thomas ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2016
  • DocketMilestone 1 Completed (Entered Date: 04-28-16 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2016
  • DocketSummons (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Krueger, Thomas ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2016
  • DocketPetition (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Krueger, Thomas ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2016
  • DocketNotice (of Case Assignment to DEPT F46 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2016
  • DocketDeclaration - UCCJEA (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Krueger, Thomas ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less