This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/19/2016 at 15:59:06 (UTC).

KRANE VS BANK OF NEW YORK

Case Summary

On 05/12/2010 KRANE filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against BANK OF NEW YORK. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JUDITH VANDER LANS. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4535

  • Filing Date:

    05/12/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JUDITH VANDER LANS

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JOEL WILLIAM KRANE

TRACY WILLIE-MAE KRANE

Defendants

AMERICAN HOME MORTGAGE SERVICES INC.

AMERICAN HOME MORTGAGE INVESTMENT TRUST

MORTGAGE BACKED NOTES SERIES 2004-4

JILL MCGOUGAN

DOES 1-100

POWER DEFAULT SERVICES INC.

Trustee

BANK OF NEW YORK

Other

FILE COPY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JOSEPH ARTHUR ROBERTS

Defendant Attorneys

LOCKE LORD BISSELL & LIDDELL LLP

GREGORY S. PAGE LAW OFFICES OF

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/20/2011
  • DocketStipulation and Order (TO ENTER DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO CERTAIN DEFTS. IN EXCHANGE FOR WAIVER OF COSTS. ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2011
  • DocketNotice (OF ENTRY OF ORDER ON STIP TO ENTER DISM WITH PREJ AS TO CERTAIN DEFS ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2011
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal-Partial (AS TO PLTS' FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AS TO DEFS JILL MCGOUGAN AND PROSPECT MORTGAGE, LLC ONLY WITH PREJ ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2011
  • DocketStipulation and Order (TO ENTER DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO CERTAIN DEFENDANTS IN EXCHANGE FOR DEFT'S WAIVER OF COSTS ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2010
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2010
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Dismissal (ENTIRE ACTION WITHOUT PREJ ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2010
  • DocketStatement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2010
  • DocketStatement-Case Management (FILED BY: PROSPECT MORTGAGE, LLC ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2010
  • DocketStatement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2010
  • DocketNotice of Hearing on Demurrer Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 07/22/2010
  • DocketNotice of Continuance (OF DEMURRER ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2010
  • DocketNotice of Motion (TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF COMPLAINT ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2010
  • DocketMiscellaneous-Other (REQUEST FOR J UDICIAL NTCE IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER & MTN TO STRIKE ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2010
  • DocketNotice of Hearing on Demurrer Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2010
  • DocketMiscellaneous-Other (REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NTC ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2010
  • DocketNotice of Hearing on Demurrer Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2010
  • DocketMiscellaneous-Other (RULE 3.1113 (i) APPENDIX AUTH CITE IN DEFS' DEMURRER ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2010
  • DocketRtn of Service of Summons & Compl (PARTY SERVED: JILL MCGOUGAN ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2010
  • DocketSummons Filed Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2010
  • DocketComplaint Filed (SUMMONS ISSUED ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMERICAN HOME MORTGAGE SERVICE (AHMSI) is a litigant

Latest cases where MORTGAGE-BACKED NOTES, SERIES is a litigant

Latest cases where AMERICAN HOME MORTGAGE CORP. is a litigant

Latest cases where Substitute Trustee Power Default Services, Inc. is a litigant