Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/27/2021 at 08:22:11 (UTC).

KOURTNEY LIGGINS VS ARCHDIOCESE OF LOS ANGELES ET AL

Case Summary

On 09/27/2013 KOURTNEY LIGGINS filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against ARCHDIOCESE OF LOS ANGELES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are RICHARD E. RICO, MARC MARMARO and ELIZABETH R. FEFFER. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2726

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

RICHARD E. RICO

MARC MARMARO

ELIZABETH R. FEFFER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs, Respondents and Appellants

LIGGINS KOURTNEY

ARCHDIOCESE OF LOS ANGELES

TANG MICHAEL

Defendants, Respondents and Appellants

ARCHDIOCESE OF LOS ANGELES

DOES 1 TO 100

RICKENBACKER EVELYN

TANG MICHAEL

TRANFIGURATION SCHOOL

Not Classified By Court

SANCHES BRENDA

CARILLO FELIPE F.

NATIONWIDE LEGAL LLC

DURON MARLENE

SMITH JENNIFER

SEBRING JENNIFER

MCGIVERN DIANNE M.

COOK RONALD L.

SHEGERIAN & ASSOCIATES INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

SHEGERIAN CARNEY R. ESQ.

SHEGERIAN & ASSOCIATES INC.

URBANIC JAMES

NGUYEN ANTHONY

LIM MARK IRWIN

Defendant Attorneys

SULLIVAN & BALLOG LLP

DE LEON LARA CARDIN

FERMIN VERONICA

SHOLKOFF JACK STEVEN

 

Court Documents

DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE NO.25 ETC.

1/30/2018: DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE NO.25 ETC.

Minute Order -

3/12/2018: Minute Order -

PLAINTIFF KOURTNEY LIGGINS?S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS? MOTION IN LIMINE NO.27 TO EXCLUDE WITNESSES REQUESTED BUT NOT IDENTIFIED DURING DISCO VERY DECLARATION OF CARNEY R. HEGERIAN; EXHIBITS

8/14/2018: PLAINTIFF KOURTNEY LIGGINS?S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS? MOTION IN LIMINE NO.27 TO EXCLUDE WITNESSES REQUESTED BUT NOT IDENTIFIED DURING DISCO VERY DECLARATION OF CARNEY R. HEGERIAN; EXHIBITS

Minute Order -

8/27/2018: Minute Order -

NOTICE OF RULING RE TELEPHONIC CONFERENCE CALL RE TRIAL STATUS

9/7/2018: NOTICE OF RULING RE TELEPHONIC CONFERENCE CALL RE TRIAL STATUS

Minute Order - Minute Order (Jury Trial)

10/24/2018: Minute Order - Minute Order (Jury Trial)

Jury Instructions - Jury Instructions Defendants' Third Amended Proposed Special Jury Instructions

10/24/2018: Jury Instructions - Jury Instructions Defendants' Third Amended Proposed Special Jury Instructions

Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103

3/18/2019: Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103

NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER BY DEFENDANTS THE ROMAN CATHOLIC ARCHBISHOP OF LOS ANGELES, MICHAEL TANG, AND EVELYN RICKENBACKER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPP

11/21/2013: NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER BY DEFENDANTS THE ROMAN CATHOLIC ARCHBISHOP OF LOS ANGELES, MICHAEL TANG, AND EVELYN RICKENBACKER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPP

Minute Order -

4/21/2015: Minute Order -

DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1 TO EXCLUDE REFERENCES TO LIABILITY INSURANCE; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF; DECLARATION OF NIKKI FERMIN IN SUPPORT TH

8/11/2015: DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1 TO EXCLUDE REFERENCES TO LIABILITY INSURANCE; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF; DECLARATION OF NIKKI FERMIN IN SUPPORT TH

DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 9 TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE THAT FATHER TANG REFERRED TO PLAINTIFF'S BABY AS "IT" AND CALLED PLANITIFF "MORALLY CORRUPT"; ETC.

8/11/2015: DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 9 TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE THAT FATHER TANG REFERRED TO PLAINTIFF'S BABY AS "IT" AND CALLED PLANITIFF "MORALLY CORRUPT"; ETC.

PLAINTIFF KOURTNEY LIGGINS REQUESTED COURT VOIR DIRE QUISTIONS (LASC LOCAL RULE 3.50)

8/14/2015: PLAINTIFF KOURTNEY LIGGINS REQUESTED COURT VOIR DIRE QUISTIONS (LASC LOCAL RULE 3.50)

PLAINTIFF KOURTNEY LIGGINS?S NON-OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS? MOTION INLIMJNE NO.14 TO BIFURCATE PUNITIVE DAMAGES CLAIM AND TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE REGARDING FINANCIAL CONDITION OF DEFENDANT IN THE FIRST PHA

8/18/2015: PLAINTIFF KOURTNEY LIGGINS?S NON-OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS? MOTION INLIMJNE NO.14 TO BIFURCATE PUNITIVE DAMAGES CLAIM AND TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE REGARDING FINANCIAL CONDITION OF DEFENDANT IN THE FIRST PHA

PLAINTIFF KOURTNEY LIGGINS'S NOTICE OF FILING REQUESTED PROPOSED AMENDED SPECIAL VERDICT FORMS

3/30/2016: PLAINTIFF KOURTNEY LIGGINS'S NOTICE OF FILING REQUESTED PROPOSED AMENDED SPECIAL VERDICT FORMS

DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO ADVANCE THE HEARING DATE ON PLAINTIFF'S RENEWED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLAINT

6/6/2016: DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO ADVANCE THE HEARING DATE ON PLAINTIFF'S RENEWED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLAINT

AMENDED JOINT WITNESS LIST

10/27/2016: AMENDED JOINT WITNESS LIST

NOTICE OF RULING RE DEFENDANTS' EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE THE TRIAL DATE

5/5/2017: NOTICE OF RULING RE DEFENDANTS' EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE THE TRIAL DATE

479 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/12/2045
  • DocketReply/Response; Filed by Kourtney Liggins (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 37; Jury Trial - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 37; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • DocketAppeal - Remittitur - Appeal Dismissed (B295866); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • DocketAppellate Order Dismissing Appeal (NOA:02/21/19 B295866); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Kourtney Liggins (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • DocketAppeal Record Delivered; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • DocketAppeal - Notice Court Reporter to Prepare Appeal Transcript (;B295866; NOA 2/21/19 & 2/27/19;); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • DocketAppeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103; Filed by Kourtney Liggins (Appellant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • DocketAppeal - Notice of Default Issued; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
845 More Docket Entries
  • 11/13/2013
  • DocketNOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT - CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2013
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by Kourtney Liggins (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2013
  • DocketCIVIL DEPOSIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2013
  • DocketOSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2013
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2013
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2013
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2013
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2013
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Kourtney Liggins (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2013
  • DocketPLAINTIFF KOURTNEY LIGGINSS COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR: (1) DISCRIMINATION ON THE BASIS OF AGE IN VIOLATION OF FEHA; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SHEGERIAN & ASSOCIATES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where NATIONWIDE LEGAL LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DE LEON LARA C.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SHOLKOFF JACK S. ESQ.