This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/20/2020 at 21:39:41 (UTC).

KOLODNY & ANTEAU VS LAUREN V STONE

Case Summary

On 11/18/2010 KOLODNY ANTEAU filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against LAUREN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RUTH ANN KWAN. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9775

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

RUTH ANN KWAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KOLODNY & ANTEAU

Defendants

DOES 1 THROUGH 50

STONE LAUREN V.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KOLODNY STEPHEN A. ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

CELENTINO CHRISTOPHER

 

Court Documents

Minute Order -

3/29/2011: Minute Order -

NOTICE OF COURT ORDER RE UNOPPOSED EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER SATISFYING SETTLEMENT CONTINGENCY

4/7/2011: NOTICE OF COURT ORDER RE UNOPPOSED EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER SATISFYING SETTLEMENT CONTINGENCY

Minute Order -

4/26/2011: Minute Order -

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY-..CIV1L (WITHOUT COURT ORDER)

9/20/2011: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY-..CIV1L (WITHOUT COURT ORDER)

Minute Order -

10/18/2011: Minute Order -

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF HEARING ON COURTS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL

10/20/2011: NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF HEARING ON COURTS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL

Minute Order -

12/16/2011: Minute Order -

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/19/2011
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 72; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Advanced to a Previous Date) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2011
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2011
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal & P/S; Filed by Kolodny & Anteau (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2011
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal & P/S; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2011
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 72; Court Order (Court Order; Order of Dismissal) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2011
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Kolodny & Anteau (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2011
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2011
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2011
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 72; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2011
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
42 More Docket Entries
  • 11/29/2010
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Kolodny & Anteau (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2010
  • DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by Kolodny & Anteau (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2010
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2010
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2010
  • DocketOSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2010
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2010
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2010
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Kolodny & Anteau (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2010
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2010
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR: (1) BREACH OF WRITTEN CONTRACT; ETC.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KOLODNY & ANTEAU is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CELENTINO CHRISTOPHER