This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/11/2016 at 18:39:33 (UTC).

KOBY INTERNATIONAL INC. VS. LEEOR SHLOMO ET. AL.

Case Summary

On 05/13/2014 KOBY INTERNATIONAL INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against LEEOR SHLOMO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LAWRENCE CHO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2544

  • Filing Date:

    05/13/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Santa Monica Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

LAWRENCE CHO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KOBY INTERNATIONAL INC.

Defendants

COAST NATIONAL SALES

SHLOMO LEEOR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KLASKIN HAROLD C.

Defendant Attorneys

BEITCHMAN & ZEKIAN

NOUDEL YOSSI

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/04/2016
  • Substitution of Attorney Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2015
  • Notice-Case Reassignment and Order Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2015
  • Answer to Cross-Complaint Filed by Atty for Plaintiff and Cross-Deft

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2015
  • Cross-complaint filed Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2015
  • Answer to Complaint Filed Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2015
  • Notice of Ruling Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2015
  • Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2015
  • Reply (TO OPP TO MTN TO STRIKE ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2015
  • Reply (TO OPP TO DEMURRER ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2015
  • Opposition (TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT; ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2015
  • Opposition (TO DEFENDANT'S DEMURRER; ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2014
  • Notice of Ruling Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2014
  • Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2014
  • Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2014
  • Notice (OF HEARING ON DEMURRER AND DEMURRER ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2014
  • Notice of Motion (AND MOTION TO STRIKE ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2014
  • Complaint Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2014
  • Summons Filed Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less