This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/12/2016 at 05:45:22 (UTC).

KIMA MATOSYAN VS CITY OF GLENDALE

Case Summary

On 09/25/2012 KIMA MATOSYAN filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CITY OF GLENDALE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Glendale Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are DONNA FIELDS GOLDSTEIN, ADR NEUTRAL, DAVID S. MILTON, C. EDWARD SIMPSON, SAMANTHA P. JESSNER and MASTER CALENDAR. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9249

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Glendale Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

DONNA FIELDS GOLDSTEIN

ADR NEUTRAL

DAVID S. MILTON

C. EDWARD SIMPSON

SAMANTHA P. JESSNER

MASTER CALENDAR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MATOSYAN KIMA

Defendants

CITY OF GLENDALE

OCAMPO & SONS

315 ARDEN LLC

CITY OF GLENDALE A PUBLIC ENTITY

OCAMPO RAMIRO JR.

Not Classified By Court

ALEXANDER LEON J.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BEITCHMAN & ZEKIAN

ZEYTUNTSYAN ANDREW

ZEYTUNTSYAN ANDREW LAW OFFICES OF PC

BEITCHMAN & ZEKIAN APLC

Defendant Attorneys

THARPE & HOWELL

RAWCLIFFE ANDREW C. DEPUTY CITY ATTY

CITY ATTORNEY-GLENDALE

 

Court Documents

DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY

7/3/2013: DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

7/3/2013: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

SUMMONS

7/3/2013: SUMMONS

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT (FICTITIOUS LLNCORRECT NAME)

4/22/2013: AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT (FICTITIOUS LLNCORRECT NAME)

Unknown

10/1/2013: Unknown

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

10/1/2013: NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT

8/20/2013: ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT

Unknown

10/8/2013: Unknown

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT (FICTITIOUS /INCORRECT NAME)

4/22/2013: AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT (FICTITIOUS /INCORRECT NAME)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 315 ARDEN, LLC'S CROSS COMPLAINT ON THE CITY OF GLENDALE

7/16/2013: PROOF OF SERVICE OF 315 ARDEN, LLC'S CROSS COMPLAINT ON THE CITY OF GLENDALE

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

3/6/2014: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

4/22/2013: AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

2/25/2014: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

CIVIL DEPOSIT

7/3/2013: CIVIL DEPOSIT

MINUTE ORDER

5/6/2013: MINUTE ORDER

CROSS-COMPLAINT FOR INDEMNITY, EQUITABLE APPORTIONMENT AND DECLARATORY RELIEF

7/3/2013: CROSS-COMPLAINT FOR INDEMNITY, EQUITABLE APPORTIONMENT AND DECLARATORY RELIEF

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

5/29/2013: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/16/2014
  • Proof of Service Filed by Atty for Defendant and Cross-Compl

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2014
  • Answer to Complaint (315 ARDEN LLC ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2014
  • Partial Dismissal (with Prejudice) (DEFENDANT CITY OF GLENDALE ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2014
  • Request for Entry of Dismissal (WITH PREJUDICE/ENTIRE ACTION ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2014
  • Request for Entry of Dismissal (w/ prej entire action ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2013
  • Receipt (civil deposit; ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2013
  • Notice (POSTING JURY FEES; ) Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2013
  • Receipt Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2013
  • Answer to Cross-Complaint (CITY OF GLENDALE ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/X-Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2013
  • Receipt Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 01/30/2013
  • Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2013
  • Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2012
  • Answer to Complaint Filed Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2012
  • Motion (MOTION FOR PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE PURSUANT C.C.P. 170.6 ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2012
  • Affidavit of Prejudice-Peremptory Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2012
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2012
  • Notice-Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2012
  • Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2012
  • Summons Filed Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2012
  • Notice (of OSC re trial court delay reduction ) Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.