This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/09/2019 at 23:04:34 (UTC).

KIERAN GRANER, ET AL VS. DOUG DE COSTER, ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/22/2015 KIERAN GRANER filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against DOUG DE COSTER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RAMONA G. SEE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0730

  • Filing Date:

    07/22/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Torrance Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

RAMONA G. SEE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GRANER KIERAN

GRANER SHARON

Defendants

DE COSTER DOUG

DE COSTER ELSA

DOES 1 THROUGH 10

HALDERMAN ROBERT H.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SPIERER WOODWARD CORBALIS & GOLDBERG

Defendant Attorney

TRUTANICH DOMINIC J.

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/22/2015: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons

7/22/2015: Summons

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

8/7/2015: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Answer

9/2/2015: Answer

Minute Order

1/11/2016: Minute Order

Exhibit List

7/22/2016: Exhibit List

Witness List

7/22/2016: Witness List

Minute Order

7/26/2016: Minute Order

Minute Order

2/15/2017: Minute Order

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

5/4/2017: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Legacy Document

5/30/2017: Legacy Document

Notice

8/14/2017: Notice

Minute Order

11/9/2017: Minute Order

Minute Order

11/13/2017: Minute Order

Minute Order

2/28/2018: Minute Order

Notice of Stay of Proceedings (Bankruptcy)

2/28/2018: Notice of Stay of Proceedings (Bankruptcy)

Minute Order

4/11/2019: Minute Order

Notice

4/11/2019: Notice

35 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/12/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department M; Order to Show Cause Re: (reBankruptcy) - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department M; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • Notice ( of Continuance of OSC re Status of Bankruptcy); Filed by KIERAN GRANER (Plaintiff); SHARON GRANER (Plaintiff); DOUG DE COSTER (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • Status Report; Filed by KIERAN GRANER (Plaintiff); SHARON GRANER (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department M; (Order to Show Cause) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • Minute Order ((Legacy Event Type : Order to Show Cause)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department M; (Order to Show Cause; Continued by Court) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • Minute order entered: 2018-05-25 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • at 08:34 AM in Department M; Non-Jury Trial (Court Trial - Short Cause; Matter Placed Off Calendar) -

    Read MoreRead Less
51 More Docket Entries
  • 10/06/2015
  • Answer; Filed by ELSA DE COSTER (Defendant); ROBERT H. HALDERMAN (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2015
  • Answer; Filed by DOUG DE COSTER (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2015
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by KIERAN GRANER (Plaintiff); SHARON GRANER (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2015
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by KIERAN GRANER (Plaintiff); SHARON GRANER (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2015
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by KIERAN GRANER (Plaintiff); SHARON GRANER (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2015
  • OSC-RE Other (Miscellaneous); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2015
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by KIERAN GRANER (Plaintiff); SHARON GRANER (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2015
  • Summons; Filed by KIERAN GRANER (Plaintiff); SHARON GRANER (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2015
  • Complaint; Filed by KIERAN GRANER (Plaintiff); SHARON GRANER (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2015
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by KIERAN GRANER (Plaintiff); SHARON GRANER (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.