This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 09:30:30 (UTC).

KEVIN ROBERTS VS T MOBILE USA INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/01/2013 KEVIN ROBERTS filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against T MOBILE USA INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are ELIA WEINBACH, MICHELLE WILLIAMS COURT, JOHN P. DOYLE, RALPH C. HOFER and CAROLYN KUHL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3792

  • Filing Date:

    07/01/2013

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

ELIA WEINBACH

MICHELLE WILLIAMS COURT

JOHN P. DOYLE

RALPH C. HOFER

CAROLYN KUHL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

ROBERTS KEVIN

Defendants, Respondents and Cross Plaintiffs

DOES 1 TO 100

OMNIPOINT COMMUNICATIONS INC.

T MOBILE USA INC.

T MOBILE WEST CORPORATION

ROLCOM INC. DOE 1 DOE 11 DOE 21

T-MOBILE US INC.

TEKSYSTEMS INC. - DOE 10 DOE 20 DOE 30

ANTHONY SERPA - DOE 8 DOE 18 DOE 28

AT&T

PARSONS CORPORATION

T-MOBILE WEST LLC - DOE 51

PACBELL DOING BUSINESS AS AT& T - DOE 52

SURESITE CONSULTING GROUP LLC - DOE 7

ROLCOM INC.

Cross Defendants

CAL VADA SURVEYING INC.

RANDALL D. ROBB

MICHAEL SHEWBRIDGE ARCHITECT INC.

WIRELESS WORLD CONNECTED INC.

Applicant

GONZALEZ THOMAS IVARRA

31 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

SUNIL SHAH LAW OFFICES OF

LAW OFFICES OF SUNIL SHAH

MOSTERT NICK JAN

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

SOIBELMAN ADAM J. ESQ.

SOIBELMAN ADAM JEROME

R2 LAW GROUP LLP

WATTEN DISCOE BASSETT & MCMAINS

WATTEN WAYNE W. ESQ.

DAVIS WRIGHT TREMAINE LLP

ESTHER P. HOLM PARTNER

CAMPBELL NICK M.

DANIEL CROWLEY & ASSOCIATES

JOHN A. HAUSER LAW OFFICES OF

LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH LLP

SHEPPARD MULLIN RICHTER & HAMPTON

CLINTON & CLINTON

SEKI NISHIMURA & WATASE LLP

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

R2 LAW GROUP LLP

ESTHER P. HOLM PARTNER

LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH LLP

CAMPBELL NICHELO MICHAEL

Other Attorneys

SUNIL SHAH ESQ.

STATE COMPENSATION INSURANCE FUND

15 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

Notice of Settlement

8/28/2018: Notice of Settlement

Notice

8/17/2018: Notice

Request for Dismissal

10/5/2018: Request for Dismissal

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

7/1/2013: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

9/3/2015: NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

Legacy Document

6/26/2018: Legacy Document

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL, FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE AND RELATED MOTION AND DISCOVERY DATES

11/12/2014: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL, FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE AND RELATED MOTION AND DISCOVERY DATES

NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

7/29/2015: NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

1/6/2015: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING ANSWERS TO DISCOVERY AND FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS OF $707.50

3/6/2015: NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING ANSWERS TO DISCOVERY AND FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS OF $707.50

Notice

11/27/2018: Notice

Notice

8/28/2018: Notice

Separate Statement

7/6/2018: Separate Statement

Request for Dismissal

10/11/2018: Request for Dismissal

REQUEST TO TAKE JUDICIAL NOTICE OF CALIFORNIA BUILDING CODE, CALIFORNIA ELECTRIC CODE AND GLENDALE BUILDING AND SAFETY CODE UNDER EVIDENCE CODE SECTION 452.

8/3/2015: REQUEST TO TAKE JUDICIAL NOTICE OF CALIFORNIA BUILDING CODE, CALIFORNIA ELECTRIC CODE AND GLENDALE BUILDING AND SAFETY CODE UNDER EVIDENCE CODE SECTION 452.

Notice

7/11/2018: Notice

OPPOSITION OF DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

8/3/2015: OPPOSITION OF DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Opposition

7/10/2018: Opposition

113 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/25/2019
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department D; (Motion for Leave) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department D; Hearing on Motion for Leave - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • DocketNotice (of Continuance of Motion for Leave to Intervene); Filed by STATE COMPENSATION INSURANCE FUND (Plaintiff in Intervention)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department D; (Order to Show Cause) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Filed by KEVIN ROBERTS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • Docketat 4:00 PM in Department D; Non-Appearance Case Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • Docketat 4:00 PM in Department D; Non-Appearance Case Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • DocketMinute Order ((NON-APPEARANCE CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER CONTINUING CASE PREVIOUS...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (NON-APPEARANCE CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER CONTINUING CASE PREVIOUS...) of 10/29/2018); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (With prejudice to Complaint.); Filed by KEVIN ROBERTS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
1,718 More Docket Entries
  • 11/12/2013
  • DocketDEFENDANTS NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT; DECLARATION OF VICTORIA BLANCHARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2013
  • DocketDefendant's Demurrer; Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2013
  • DocketMotion to Strike; Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2013
  • DocketDEFENDANTS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT REQUESTING PUNITIVE DAMAGES; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2013
  • DocketDefendant's Demurrer; Filed by Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2013
  • DocketMotion to Strike; Filed by Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2013
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by KEVIN ROBERTS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2013
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2013
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2013
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.