This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/18/2019 at 13:56:27 (UTC).

KEVIN NGUYEN ET AL VS WINDSOR HEALTHCARE MANAGEMENT INC ET A

Case Summary

On 12/20/2016 KEVIN NGUYEN filed a Personal Injury - Elder/Dependant Adult Abuse lawsuit against WINDSOR HEALTHCARE MANAGEMENT INC ET A. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SUSAN BRYANT-DEASON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4563

  • Filing Date:

    12/20/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Elder/Dependant Adult Abuse

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

SUSAN BRYANT-DEASON

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

ESTATE OF HUNG MAN NGUYEN

NGUYEN DENNIS

NGUYEN KEVIN

DINH CHRISTOPHER

THE ESTATE OF HUNG MANH NGUYEN

NGUYEN PETER

Respondents and Defendants

WINDSOR GARDENS HEALTHCARE CENTER OF

WINDSOR HELAHT

WINDSOR GARDENS HEALTHCARE CENTER OF FULLERTON LLC DBA WINDSOR GARDENS CARE CENTER OF FULLERTON

S&F MANAGEMENT COMPANY INC.

WINDSOR OMG HOLDING COMPANY II LLC

WINDSOR HEALTHCARE MANAGEMENT INC.

DOES 1 THROUGH 100

S&F MANAGEMENT COMPANY INC

Defendant and Not Classified By Court

WINDSOR GARDENS HEALTHCARE CENTER OF FULLERTON LLC DBA WINDSOR GARDENS CARE CENTER OF FULLERTON

12 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

BIREN MATTHEW B.F. ESQ.

BIREN MATTHEW B.F.

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

VANDENBOS DANIELLE M.

GIOVANNIELLO ALEXANDER F. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

PLAINTIFFS' EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS IN OPPOSITION TO THE MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUES OF DEFENDANT WINDSOR GARDENS HEALTHCARE CENTER OF FULLERTON, LLC

1/24/2018: PLAINTIFFS' EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS IN OPPOSITION TO THE MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUES OF DEFENDANT WINDSOR GARDENS HEALTHCARE CENTER OF FULLERTON, LLC

EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO THE DECLARATION OF MARY WEBSTER SUPPORTING PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO THE MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUES BY DEFENDANT WINDSOR GARDENS HEALTHCARE CENTER OF FULLERTON

2/2/2018: EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO THE DECLARATION OF MARY WEBSTER SUPPORTING PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO THE MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUES BY DEFENDANT WINDSOR GARDENS HEALTHCARE CENTER OF FULLERTON

EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO THE DECLARATION OF MAY A. KIM-TENSER, M.D. SUPPORTING PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO THE MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUES BY DEFENDANT WINDSOR GARDENS HEALTHCARE CENTER O

2/2/2018: EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO THE DECLARATION OF MAY A. KIM-TENSER, M.D. SUPPORTING PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO THE MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUES BY DEFENDANT WINDSOR GARDENS HEALTHCARE CENTER O

SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF BEATRIZ BONAPARTE IN SUPPORT OF REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO THE MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUES BY DEFENDANT WINDSOR GARDENS HEALTHCARE CENTER OF FULLERTON

2/2/2018: SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF BEATRIZ BONAPARTE IN SUPPORT OF REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO THE MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUES BY DEFENDANT WINDSOR GARDENS HEALTHCARE CENTER OF FULLERTON

ORDER RE: EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO THE DECLARATION OF MARY WEBSTER SUPPORTING PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO THE MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUES BY DEFENDANT WINDSOR GARDENS HEALTHCARE CENTER OF

2/7/2018: ORDER RE: EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO THE DECLARATION OF MARY WEBSTER SUPPORTING PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO THE MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUES BY DEFENDANT WINDSOR GARDENS HEALTHCARE CENTER OF

Minute Order

2/7/2018: Minute Order

NOTICE OF TAKING MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER RE: SCOPE OF PMQ DEPOSITION; ETC

2/21/2018: NOTICE OF TAKING MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER RE: SCOPE OF PMQ DEPOSITION; ETC

NOTICE OF OPPOSITION AND OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE THE DEADLINE TO FILE AN OPPOSITION TO S&F MANAGEMENT COMPANY, LLC'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR IN THE ALTERNATIV

3/13/2018: NOTICE OF OPPOSITION AND OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE THE DEADLINE TO FILE AN OPPOSITION TO S&F MANAGEMENT COMPANY, LLC'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR IN THE ALTERNATIV

PLAINTIFFS? EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO THE DECLARATION OF DIANE K. LANGEMO IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT S&F MANAGEMENT COMPANY, LLC?S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICA

5/7/2018: PLAINTIFFS? EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO THE DECLARATION OF DIANE K. LANGEMO IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT S&F MANAGEMENT COMPANY, LLC?S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICA

PLAINTIFFS? MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT S&F MANAGEMENT COMPANY, LLC?S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUES

5/7/2018: PLAINTIFFS? MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT S&F MANAGEMENT COMPANY, LLC?S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUES

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

12/27/2016: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE AND ORDER

2/2/2017: NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE AND ORDER

Unknown

2/24/2017: Unknown

DECLARATION OF DIANE K. LANGEMO, PH.D., RN, FAAN, IN SUPPORT OF THE MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUES,; ETC.

8/30/2017: DECLARATION OF DIANE K. LANGEMO, PH.D., RN, FAAN, IN SUPPORT OF THE MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUES,; ETC.

DECLARATION OF OANH K. TRAN IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER SPECIALLY SETTING A HEARING ON THE MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR AN ORDER CONTINUING THE CURRE

8/31/2017: DECLARATION OF OANH K. TRAN IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER SPECIALLY SETTING A HEARING ON THE MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR AN ORDER CONTINUING THE CURRE

DECLARATION OF DANIELLE M. VANDENBOS IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER SPECIALLY SETTING A HEARING ON THE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSU

8/31/2017: DECLARATION OF DANIELLE M. VANDENBOS IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER SPECIALLY SETTING A HEARING ON THE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSU

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER SPECIALLY SETTING A HEARING ON THE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUES OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR AN ORDER CONTINUING

8/31/2017: EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER SPECIALLY SETTING A HEARING ON THE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUES OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR AN ORDER CONTINUING

PLAINTIFFS' EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE AND ALL RELATED DEADLINES; OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, REQUEST FOR AN ORDER SHORTENING TIME FOR A REGULARLY NOTICED MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL; DECLARA

10/11/2017: PLAINTIFFS' EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE AND ALL RELATED DEADLINES; OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, REQUEST FOR AN ORDER SHORTENING TIME FOR A REGULARLY NOTICED MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL; DECLARA

148 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/17/2019
  • at 08:31 AM in Department 52, Susan Bryant-Deason, Presiding; Hearing on Motion - Other (Petition to Confirm and Enforce the Binding Arbitration Award)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 52, Susan Bryant-Deason, Presiding; Hearing on Motion - Other (PLAINTIFFS' PETITION TO VACATE ARBITRATION AWARD AND RESPONSE TO PETITION TO CONFIRM AWARD. (Adv. from 6/26/19))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore; Filed by Kevin Nguyen (Plaintiff); Christopher Dinh (Plaintiff); Dennis Nguyen (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • Reply (to Plaintiff's Opposition to Confirm and Enforce the Binding Arbitration); Filed by S&F Management Company, Inc (Defendant); Windsor Gardens Healthcare Center of Fullerton, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • Reply (PLAINTIFFS' REPLY TO DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO PLTAINTIFFS' PETITION TO VACATE ARBITRATION AWARD); Filed by Kevin Nguyen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • Opposition (PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO PETITION TO CONFIRM AND ENFORCE ARBITRATION AWARD); Filed by Kevin Nguyen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • Declaration (OF ALEXANDER F. GIOVANNIELLO IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS? PETITION TO VACATE ARBITRATION AWARD BY DEFENDANTS WINDSOR GARDENS HEALTHCARE CENTER OF FULLERTON, LLC dba WINDSOR GARDENS CARE CENTER OF FULLERTON AND S&F MANAGEMENT CO); Filed by S&F Management Company, Inc (Defendant); Windsor Gardens Healthcare Center of Fullerton, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • Notice of Lodging (LODGMENT OF EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS? PETITION TO VACATE ARBITRATION AWARD BY DEFENDANTS WINDSOR GARDENS HEALTHCARE CENTER OF FULLERTON, LLC dba WINDSOR GARDENS CARE CENTER OF FULLERTON AND S&F MANAGEMENT COMPANY, LLC); Filed by S&F Management Company, Inc (Defendant); Windsor Gardens Healthcare Center of Fullerton, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • Opposition (NOTICE OF OPPOSITION AND OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS? PETITION TO VACATE ARBITRATION AWARD BY DEFENDANTS WINDSOR GARDENS HEALTHCARE CENTER OF FULLERTON, LLC dba WINDSOR GARDENS CARE CENTER OF FULLERTON AND S&F MANAGEMENT COMPANY, LLC); Filed by S&F Management Company, Inc (Defendant); Windsor Gardens Healthcare Center of Fullerton, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 52, Susan Bryant-Deason, Presiding; Hearing on Ex Parte Application ( for Plaintiff's petition to vacate arbitration award) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
105 More Docket Entries
  • 01/27/2017
  • Answer to Complaint (AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL Windsor Healthcare Management, Inc S&F Management Company, Inc. Windsor Gardens Healthcare Center); Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2017
  • Receipt (JURY FEES $150 ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2017
  • Notice of Status Conference filed; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2017
  • Proof-Service/Summons (AS TO: Windsor Gardens Healthcare Center ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2017
  • Proof-Service/Summons (AS TO: Windsor Healthcare Management S&F Management Company, Inc.); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2016
  • OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2016
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2016
  • Petition (Other Petition); Filed by Kevin Nguyen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2016
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Kevin Nguyen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2016
  • Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where S&F MANAGEMENT COMPANY INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where WINDSOR OMG HOLDING COMPANY II,LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where WINDSOR HEALTHCARE MANAGEMENT, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where WINDSOR GARDENS HEALTHCARE CENTER OF HAY- is a litigant